EP0777465 - THICKENED NONABRASIVE PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOWLER, Timothy, John 7832-A Village Drive Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
MCMANUS, Richard, Loren 5393 Pinecastle Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 03 /
DECKNER, George, Endel 10572 Tanager Hills Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | McKinney, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Departmen Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | McKinney, Victoria, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Departmen, Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2001/10] | Woof, Victoria, et al Patent Dept., Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [1997/24] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble (Health & Beauty Care) Limited, Lovett House, Lovett Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95929594.0 | 16.08.1995 | [1997/24] | WO1995US10486 | Priority number, date | US19940296566 | 26.08.1994 Original published format: US 296566 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606596 | Date: | 07.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777465 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777465 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/06 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/894 (EP,US);
A61K8/72 (KR);
A61K8/0241 (EP,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/8111 (EP,US);
A61K8/8117 (EP,US);
A61K8/8147 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K8/8158 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61K8/87 (EP,US);
A61K8/88 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61K8/92 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/24] | Title | German: | VERDICKTES NICHTABRASIVES KÖRPERWASCHMITTEL | [1998/52] | English: | THICKENED NONABRASIVE PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS | [1997/24] | French: | PREPARATIONS D'HYGIENE CORPORELLE NON ABRASIVES EPAISSIES | [1997/24] |
Former [1997/24] | VERDICKTER NICHTABRASIVES KÖRPERWASCHMITTEL | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 23.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.2000
18.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Goldwell GmbH Zerninstrasse 10-18 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 02
03.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.2000
18.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Goldwell GmbH Zerninstrasse 10-18 D-64297 Darmstadt / DE | ||
02
03.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2000/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.2000
ADMISSIBLE Goldwell GmbH Zerninstrasse 10-18 D-64297 Darmstadt / DE | 06.09.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.04.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.02.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.1999 | BE | 03.11.1999 | CH | 03.11.1999 | FR | 03.11.1999 | IT | 03.11.1999 | LI | 03.11.1999 | NL | 03.11.1999 | SE | 03.11.1999 | DK | 03.02.2000 | PT | 03.02.2000 | DE | 04.02.2000 | ES | 04.02.2000 | GR | 04.02.2000 | LU | 16.08.2000 | GB | 16.08.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/30] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
FR | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
ES | 04.02.2000 | ||
GR | 04.02.2000 | ||
LU | 16.08.2000 | ||
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
FR | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
ES | 04.02.2000 | ||
GR | 04.02.2000 | ||
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
ES | 04.02.2000 | ||
GR | 04.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2004/38] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
ES | 04.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/13] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
GB | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/09] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/06] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
CH | 03.11.1999 | ||
LI | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
BE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
CH | 08.02.2000 | ||
LI | 08.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
CH | 08.02.2000 | ||
LI | 08.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2008943 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 1, column 2, line 78 - line 104; claim - *; | [X]US4309411 (TOIDA HIROSHI, et al) [X] 1-3,8,9 * figures 1,2; example -; claims 12,13 *; | [X]EP0105657 (BEECHAM INC [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * examples 8-11 *; | [X]EP0336900 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1-4* page 5, line 65 - page 6, line 1; example 4 * |