EP0776472 - DETECTOR FOR EXPLOSIVE SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states Renishaw plc New Mills Wotton-Under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANEY, Raymond, John Laburnum Cottage, New Brookend Berkeley, Gloucestershire GL13 9SF / GB | 02 /
BATCHELDER, David, Neville 2A Foxhill Avenue Leeds, Yorkshire LS16 5PB / GB | 03 /
LACEY, Richard, John Police Scientific Development Branch St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL4 9HQ / GB | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | Jackson, John Timothy, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Jackson, John Timothy, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95929937.1 | 21.08.1995 | [1997/23] | WO1995GB01979 | Priority number, date | GB19940016889 | 20.08.1994 Original published format: GB 9416889 | GB19940026241 | 24.12.1994 Original published format: GB 9426241 | GB19950009264 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: GB 9509264 | [1997/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606346 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0776472 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0776472 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/65 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
G01N21/65 (EP,US);
G01N21/658 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1997/23] | Title | German: | DETEKTOR FÜR EXPLOSIVE SUBSTANZEN | [1997/23] | English: | DETECTOR FOR EXPLOSIVE SUBSTANCES | [1997/23] | French: | DETECTEUR DE SUBSTANCES EXPLOSIVES | [1997/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1997 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 22.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.1999 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request deemed not to be filed | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.05.1999 | [2008/06] | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0543578 (RENISHAW TRANSDUCER SYST [GB]) [DY] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0455516 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB], et al) [DA] 2,3 * the whole document * | [YD] - J.AKHAVAN, "Analysis of high-explosive samples by Fourier transform Raman spectroscopy", SPECTROCHIMICA ACTA, GREAT BRITAIN, vol. 47A, no. 9/10, pages 1247 - 1250 [YD] 1-8 * figures 1,3,4 * | [Y] - CARVER F W S ET AL, "Spectroscopic studies of explosives. I. Detection of nitro compounds on silica gel and carbon by non-resonant Raman spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY, DEC. 1983, UK, ISSN 0377-0486, vol. 14, no. 6, pages 410 - 414 [Y] 1-8 * figures 1,4 * | [DPX] - C.CHENG ET AL., "In Situ Detection and Identification of Trace Explosives by Raman Microscopy", JOURNAL OF FORENSIC SCIENCES, vol. 40, no. 1, pages 31 - 37 [DPX] 1-8 * the whole document * | Examination | - JOURNAL OF RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY, DEC. 1983, UK, vol. 14, no. 6ISSN 0377-0486, | - pages 410-414CARVER F W S ET AL 'Spectroscopic studies of explosives. I. Detection of nitro compounds on silica gel and carbon by non-resonant Raman spectroscopy' |