EP0774969 - HIV PROTEASE INHIBITOR COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEUTSCH, Paul, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
EMINI, Emilio, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
VACCA, Joseph, P. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95930118.5 | 07.08.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US09956 | Priority number, date | US19940289474 | 11.08.1994 Original published format: US 289474 | US19940339369 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 339369 | US19950492461 | 20.07.1995 Original published format: US 492461 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9604913 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774969 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774969 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0774969 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61K31/435, A61K31/425, // (A61K31/495, 31:47),(A61K31/495, 31:435),(A61K31/495, 31:425) | [1997/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP);
A61K31/495 (KR);
A61K31/425 (KR);
A61K31/435 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/496, A61K31/427 (EP);
A61K31/496, A61K31/435 (EP);
A61K31/496, A61K31/4709 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/22] | Extension states | SI | 31.01.1997 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN VON HIV-PROTEASE INHIBITOREN | [1997/22] | English: | HIV PROTEASE INHIBITOR COMBINATION | [1997/22] | French: | COMBINAISON DE L'INHIBITEUR DE LA PROTEASE DU VIH | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 25.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP0346847 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [YD] 1,2,6-9 * page 13, line 56 *; | [YD]EP0486948 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [YD] 1,4,6-9 * page 143, line 8 - page 144, line 11 *; | [YD]WO9208698 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [YD] 1,3,6-9 * page 129, lines 8-33 *; | [YD]WO9208700 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [YD] 1,3,6-9 * page 127, line 25 - page 128, line 13 *; | [YD]EP0541168 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [YD] 1-9* page 46, line 27 - line 34 *; | [YD]WO9414436 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [YD] 1,4,6-9 * page 173, paragraph 8 - page 176, paragraph 4 * | [Y] - VACCA JP; DORSEY BD; SCHLEIF WA; LEVIN RB; MCDANIEL SL; DARKE PL; ZUGAY J, "L-735,524: an orally bioavailable human immunodeficiency virus type 1", PROC NATL ACAD SCI, USA, (19940426), pages 4096 - 4100 [Y] 1-9 * page 4099, column 2, paragraph 3 * |