EP0777482 - COMBINED PREPARATION FOR THE THERAPY OF IMMUNE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2001/46] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖNHARTING, Martin Neuer Weg 6 D-65232 Taunusstein / DE | 02 /
MÜLLNER, Stefan Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 43 D-65239 Hochheim / DE | 03 /
ZABEL, Peter Kühneweg 47 D-23795 Segeberg / DE | [1997/24] | Application number, filing date | 95930441.1 | 07.08.1995 | [1997/24] | WO1995EP03125 | Priority number, date | DE19944430128 | 25.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4430128 | [1997/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9605838 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777482 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777482 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/55, A61K31/52, A61K38/13, A61K45/06 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K31/554 (EP,US);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/522, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/522, A61K31/277 (EP,US);
A61K31/522, A61K31/4422 (US,EP);
A61K31/554, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/554, A61K31/4375 (US,EP);
A61K31/554, A61K31/522 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/24] | Extension states | SI | 25.03.1997 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSPRÄPARAT ZUR ANWENDUNG BEI IMMUNOLOGISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [1997/24] | English: | COMBINED PREPARATION FOR THE THERAPY OF IMMUNE DISEASES | [1997/24] | French: | PREPARATION COMBINEE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES IMMUNITAIRES | [1997/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 14.11.2001 | [2002/49] | Cited in | International search | [DXY]EP0234262 (RENTSCHLER ARZNEIMITTEL [DE]) [DX] 1-5,7 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [DY]EP0490181 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]) [DY] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0493682 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]) [DY] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]EP0544391 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * * claims 1,4 * | [XY] - REECE D E ET AL, "CHRONIC GRAFT VERSUS-HOST DISEASE CGVHD IN PATIENTS PTS RECEIVING UNRELATED DONOR UD ALLOGENEIC BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTS ALLO BMTS INCIDENCE RISK FACTORS AND OUTCOME", ANNUAL MEETING OF THE CANADIAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL INVESTIGATION AND THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF CANADA, OTTAWA, ONTARIO, CANADA, SEPTEMBER 11-14, 1992. CLIN INVEST MED, 15 (4 SUPPL.). 1992. A61. [XY] 1-7 * abstract * | [XY] - D.J. STEWART ET AL., "Addition of Pentoxifylline plus Nifedipine to chemotherapy in patients with Cisplatin-resistant cancers of the lung and other sites.", AM J CLIN ONCOL, vol. 17, no. 4, pages 313 - 316 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7 | [XY] - G. BERKENBOOM ET AL., "Prevention of Cyclosporine A-induced vascular toxicity by Pentoxifylline", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL, vol. 18, no. 5, pages 761- - 768 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7 | [XY] - B. SARRIA ET AL., "The Nicardipine-Isoprenaline interaction in human and guinea-pig isolated airways", FUNDAM CLIN PHARMACOL, (19940216), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 26 - 33 [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [Y] 4,6,7 | [X] - K.S. GALDAL ET AL., "Inhibition of the thromboplastin response of endothelial cells in vitro", BIOCHEM PHARMACOL, vol. 33, no. 17, pages 2723 - 2726 [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * | [PXY] - CARRIER M ET AL, "Effect of pentoxifylline on renal toxicity of cyclosporine: preliminary results.", TRANSPLANT PROC, OCT 1994, 26 (5) P2745-6, UNITED STATES [PX] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7 | [POX] - KHABAR K S A ET AL, "Pentoxifylline selectively potentiates cyclosporin A (CYA)-mediated suppression of mixed lymphocyte cytotoxicity (MLC) among other immunological functions", THE 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF IMMUNOLOGY;MEETING SPONSORED BY THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS AND THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF IMMUNOLOGICAL SOCIETIES, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, USA, JULY 23-29, 1995; CONFERENCE PAPER, page 852 [POX] 1-7 * abstract * |