EP0767666 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL IN PROPHYLAXIS AND THERAPY OF ENDOTOXIN RELATED CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sepsicure, L.L.C. 1 Harmon Plaza Secaucas, NJ 07094 / US | [1998/49] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states THE ROGOSIN INSTITUTE 505 East 70th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVINE, Daniel M. 430 East 63 Street New York, NY 10021 / US | 02 /
PARKER, Thomas S. 222 Seeley Avenue Brooklyn, NY 11216 / US | 03 /
RUBIN, Albert L. 220 Allison Court Englewood, NJ 07631 / US | 04 /
GORDON, Bruce R. 1161 York Avenue New York, NY 10021 / US | 05 /
SAAL, Stuart D. 345 East 57th Street New York, NY 10022 / US | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [1997/16] | Learoyd, Stephanie Anne, et al Glaxo Wellcome plc, Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95930812.3 | 10.08.1995 | [1997/16] | WO1995US10189 | Priority number, date | US19940288568 | 10.08.1994 Original published format: US 288568 | US19950487459 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 487459 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9604916 | Date: | 22.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0767666 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0767666 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.02.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/56, A61K31/225, A61K31/685, // A61K31/66, A61K31/575, A61P31/00 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K9/1275 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07K14/775 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/685, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/685, A61K31/575 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1998/41] | A61K31/56, A61K31/225, A61K31/685, // A61K31/66, A61K31/575 | ||
Former IPC [1997/16] | A61K31/56, A61K31/225, A61K31/685 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/16] | Extension states | LT | 04.02.1997 | LV | 04.02.1997 | SI | 04.02.1997 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND PRÄPARATE FÜR DIE PROPHYLAXE UND THERAPIE VON MIT ENDOTOXIN VERBUNDENEN ZUSTÄNDEN | [1997/16] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USEFUL IN PROPHYLAXIS AND THERAPY OF ENDOTOXIN RELATED CONDITIONS | [1997/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET COMPOSITIONS UTILES DANS LA PROPHYLAXIE ET LA THERAPIE D'ETATS LIES A L'ENDOTOXINE | [1997/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 04.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 31.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Request for further processing for: | 25.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 25.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6193111 ; | [X]DE2556592 (NATTERMANN A & CIE) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-15,17 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 37; examples 1-6 *; | [X]US4115313 (LYON IRVING, et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-15,17 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 64 * * column 5, lines 15-17 *; | [Y]US4314997 (SHANBROM EDWARD) [Y] 1-19 * column 2, lines 24-39 * * column 3, lines 38-40 *; | [X]EP0074251 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) [X] 20,21,23,24 * page 7, lines 23-27; table 1 *; | [X]EP0391369 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-15,17 * claims 1,16,17,19,20; table 1 *; | [X]DE4017979 (MEYER LUCAS GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 20,21,23,24 * example 1; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE4310935 (ZERBINI E J FUNDACAO [BR]) [X] 20,21,23,24 * claims 1-6 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 25, Database accession no. 86-159566, XP002072702 & JPS6193111 A 00000000 (FUNAYAMA M) [Y] 1,19 * abstract * | [Y] - KOCSAR ET AL., "Effect of bile acids on the intestinal absorption of endotoxin in rats", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (196910), vol. 100, no. 1, pages 220- - 223, XP002073198 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [X] - SCHWARZENBERG ET AL., "Ursodeoxycholic acid modifies gut-derived endotoxemia in neonatal rats", PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 214 - 217, XP002073199 [X] 1-19 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5000958 (FOUNTAIN MICHAEL W [US], et al) |