EP0802433 - OPTICAL FIBER WITH LENS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAMIKI SEIMITSU HOUSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 8-22, Shinden 3-chome, Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8511 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states NAMIKI SEIMITSU HOUSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 8-22, Shinden 3-chome, Adachi-ku Tokyo 123 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUSHIMA, Takuji 8-22, Shinden 3-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 123 / JP | 02 /
SHIBUTANI, Michitomo 8-22, Shinden 3-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 123 / JP | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/43] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95931431.1 | 18.09.1995 | [1997/43] | WO1995JP01853 | Priority number, date | JP19940248633 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: JP 24863394 | [1997/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9608738 | Date: | 21.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802433 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/10, G02B6/32, G02B6/42 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
G02B6/4203 (EP,US);
G02B6/4206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/43] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FASER MIT LINSE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1997/43] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER WITH LENS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [1997/43] | French: | FIBRE OPTIQUE A LENTILLE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.1997 | Translation filed | 14.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 14.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 22.01.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/04] | 03.06.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/04] | 09.07.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Appeal following examination | 18.09.2003 | Appeal received No. T1166/03 | 04.11.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.10.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 18.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.10.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2077943 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 5; figures 7A-7C * * page 4, line 6 - line 39; figures 10A,10B *; | [X]US3910677 (BECKER EDWARD EUGENE, et al) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 21 * * column 5, line 12 - line 31; figures 1-3; claims 1,2 *; | [X] - SAKAGUCHI H ET AL, "POWER COUPLING FROM LASER DIODES INTO SINGLE-MODE FIBRES WITH QUADRANGULAR PYRAMID-SHAPED HEMIELLIPSOIDAL ENDS", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19810611), vol. 17, no. 12, page 425/426, XP000615115 [X] 2,4 * page 425, column 1; figure 2 * | International search | [X]JPS5732517B ; | [X]JPS61241710 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS5082749 ; | [A]JPS5743883B |