EP0781140 - CORTICOTROPIN RELEASE INHIBITING FACTOR AND METHODS OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania University of Pennsylvania Suite 300 3700 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19104-3147 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA University of Pennsylvania, Suite 300, 3700 Market Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104-3147 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDEI, Eva Apartment 1611 135 S. 19th Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 02 /
AIRD, Fraser 1808 Pemberton Street Philadelphia, PA 19146 / US | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95931786.8 | 08.09.1995 | [1997/27] | WO1995US11455 | Priority number, date | US19940304383 | 12.09.1994 Original published format: US 304383 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9608265 | Date: | 21.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0781140 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/16, C07K14/575, C07K16/26, A61K38/06, A61K38/00, C07K5/08, C07H21/04, G01N33/53 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/575 (EP,US);
C07K16/26 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/27] | A61K38/06, A61K38/00, C07K5/08, C07K14/575, C07K16/00, C07H21/04, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/27] | Title | German: | DIE CORTICOTROPINFREISETZUNG INHIBIERENDER FAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER NUTZUNG | [1997/27] | English: | CORTICOTROPIN RELEASE INHIBITING FACTOR AND METHODS OF USING SAME | [1997/27] | French: | FACTEUR INHIBITEUR DE LIBERATION DE LA CORTICOTROPINE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [1997/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 11.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/05] | 28.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2003 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BRUHN T. O. ET AL., "Thyrotropin-releasing hormone (TRH) gene expression in the anterior pituitary. I. Presence of pro-TRH messenger ribonucleic acid and pro-TRH-derived peptide in a subpopulation of somatotrophs.", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (199402), vol. 134, no. 2, pages 815 - 820, XP002114937 [A] 1-18,20-22,24-36 * page 817, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.134.2.815 | [PX] - REDEI E. ET AL., "Corticotropin release inhibiting factor is encoded within prepro - TRH.", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (199504), vol. 136, no. 4, pages 1813 - 1816, XP002114645 [PX] 1-6,13-15 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.136.4.1813 | International search | [X] - MORI M. ET AL., "Different posttranslational processing of human preprothyrotropin releasins hormone in the human placenta and hypothalamus", J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (1992), vol. 75, no. 6, pages 1535 - 1539 |