EP0777740 - GENETIC THERAPY OF DISEASES OF THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM WITH A CELL-SPECIFIC ACTIVE SUBSTANCE WHICH IS DEPENDENT ON THE CELL CYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/25] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDLACEK, Hans-Harald Sonnenhang 3 D-35041 Marburg / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Rolf Poitiersstrasse 8 D-35037 Marburg / DE | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/40] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95931933.6 | 25.08.1995 | [1997/24] | WO1995EP03369 | Priority number, date | GB19940017366 | 26.08.1994 Original published format: GB 9417366 | GB19950006466 | 29.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9506466 | [1997/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606939 | Date: | 07.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777740 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777740 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/85, A61K48/00, C07K14/475, C12N15/86, C12N15/88 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
A61K48/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
C12N15/86 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/24] | Title | German: | GENTHERAPEUTISCHE BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN DES ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEMS (ZNS) DURCH EINEN ZELLSPEZIFISCHEN, ZELLZYKLUSABHÄNGIGEN WIRKSTOFF | [1997/24] | English: | GENETIC THERAPY OF DISEASES OF THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM WITH A CELL-SPECIFIC ACTIVE SUBSTANCE WHICH IS DEPENDENT ON THE CELL CYCLE | [1997/24] | French: | THERAPIE GENETIQUE DE MALADIES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL AVEC UNE SUBSTANCE ACTIVE SPECIFIQUE DE LA CELLULE ET DEPENDANT DU CYCLE CELLULAIRE | [1997/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 26.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9404137 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US]) [A] 1-17* page 28 - page 29 *; | [A]WO9408026 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * examples 9-11 * | [A] - F.EHLERT ET AL., "Cell cycle-regulated transcription of the human cdc25C gene is controlled by a novel regulatory element", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, vol. 87, no. 1(supplement), page 124 [A] 1-17 * see abstract 483 * |