EP0852371 - IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIMOTO, Hajime Room 1-508 842, Kabecho 1-chome Ome-shi Tokyo 198 / JP | 02 /
HIRAKI, Mitsuru Room D405 32, Koyasucho 2-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | 03 /
NAKAHARA, Hitoshi Room A109 14-6, Nishikoigakubo 4-chome Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185 / JP | 04 /
AKIOKA, Takashi Room 105 7-3, Mihoricho 2-chome Akishima-shi Tokyo 196 / JP | 05 /
KANEKO, Yoshiyuki 3349-4, Motohachiojimachi 2-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | 06 /
TSUMURA, Makoto 16-1, Mikanoharamachi 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319 / JP | 07 /
MIKAMI, Yoshirou Room 424 Izumigamori-kokusairyo Mizukicho 2-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319 / JP | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1998/28] | Application number, filing date | 95932184.5 | 20.09.1995 | [1998/28] | WO1995JP01886 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711447 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852371 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852371 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
G09G3/3688 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3648 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G09G3/3677 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0814 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/027 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/10 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2340/02 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2340/0428 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/2007 (EP,US);
G09G5/006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/28] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [1998/28] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE | [1998/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES | [1998/28] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1998 | Translation filed | 07.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 07.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05023190.1 / EP1624440 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 20.11.2008 | [2010/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4774506 (BOSSOUTROUT PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1,2* column 2, line 21 - column 5, line 49; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0655725 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8,13 * column 2, line 52 - column 5, line 26; figures 2,3 *; | [E]EP0725380 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1,2 * claims 1,2 * * page 8, line 30 - page 10, line 9 *; | [E]US5598565 (REINHARDT DENNIS [US]) [E] 1 * column 4, line 29 - line 41 * * column 7, line 16 - line 45 * * figure 5; claim 16 * | International search | [A]JPS5691290 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS63289588 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPS63304294 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH02246481 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH04134419 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH05297841 (RICOH KK); | [A]JPH07123183 (RICOH KK) |