EP0781183 - SUPPORT PAD FOR DRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANIELSSON, Ake Storhagsvängen 42 S-804 24 Gävle / SE | 02 /
BLOMBERG, Torsten Dvärgastigen 12 S-811 36 Sandviken / SE | [1997/27] | Application number, filing date | 95932273.6 | 11.09.1995 | [1997/27] | WO1995SE01015 | Priority number, date | SE19940003024 | 12.09.1994 Original published format: SE 9403024 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9608332 | Date: | 21.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0781183 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0781183 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/03, B23B51/04 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
B23B51/0493 (EP,US);
B23B51/0003 (SE);
B23B29/03 (KR,SE);
B23B51/04 (SE);
B23B2251/56 (EP,SE,US);
B23B51/063 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/27] | Title | German: | STÜTZUNTERLAGE FÜR EINEN BOHRER | [1997/27] | English: | SUPPORT PAD FOR DRILL | [1997/27] | French: | BLOC D'APPUI POUR FRAISE | [1997/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 02.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2000 | BE | 23.08.2000 | CH | 23.08.2000 | LI | 23.08.2000 | NL | 23.08.2000 | IE | 11.09.2000 | LU | 11.09.2000 | DK | 23.11.2000 | PT | 23.11.2000 | SE | 23.11.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 23.08.2000 | |
BE | 23.08.2000 | ||
CH | 23.08.2000 | ||
LI | 23.08.2000 | ||
NL | 23.08.2000 | ||
IE | 11.09.2000 | ||
DK | 23.11.2000 | ||
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
SE | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 23.08.2000 | |
BE | 23.08.2000 | ||
CH | 23.08.2000 | ||
LI | 23.08.2000 | ||
NL | 23.08.2000 | ||
IE | 11.09.2000 | ||
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
SE | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 23.08.2000 | |
BE | 23.08.2000 | ||
CH | 23.08.2000 | ||
LI | 23.08.2000 | ||
IE | 11.09.2000 | ||
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
SE | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 23.08.2000 | |
BE | 23.08.2000 | ||
IE | 11.09.2000 | ||
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
SE | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 23.08.2000 | |
BE | 23.08.2000 | ||
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
SE | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT | 23.08.2000 | |
BE | 23.08.2000 | ||
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | AT | 23.08.2000 | |
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 23.08.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]SU1726154 ; | [A]DE729898 (MITTELDEUTSCHE STAHLWERKE AG); | [A]DE2057512 (SANDVIKENS JERNVERKS AB); | [A]DE2821658 (HEGENSCHEIDT GMBH WILHELM); | [A]DE2833778 (SITZMANN & HEINLEIN); | [A]US4225274 (KATZ OTTO) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 8, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1993-092189, & SU1726154 A 19920415 (SPETSTECKHOSNASTKA SCI PRODN ASSOC) |