EP0808292 - APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING A VISCOUS USE SOLUTION AND ITS USE IN DISPENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/48] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING A VISCOUS USE SOLUTION | ||
[2006/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul MN 55102-2233 / US | ||
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states ECOLAB, INC. Ecolab Center Saint Paul, MN 55101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINDORF, Richard, E. 22155-167th Street Big Lake, MN 55309 / US | 02 /
HODGE, Charles, A. 8094 Jocelyn Avenue South Cottage Grove, MN 55016 / US | 03 /
PARKER, Carleton, J. 812 Cherokee Avenue St. Paul, MN 55107 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Richard, H. 1770 Vivian Lane West St. Paul, MN 55118 / US | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95932476.5 | 11.09.1995 | [1997/48] | WO1995US11534 | Priority number, date | US19950393341 | 23.02.1995 Original published format: US 393341 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9626156 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808292 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808292 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/56, B67D1/00, B01F5/04, C11D1/65, C11D1/83, C11D1/86, C11D3/43, C11D7/06 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
B67D7/74 (EP,US);
B01F23/45 (EP,US);
B01F23/451 (EP,US);
B01F23/471 (EP,US);
B01F25/312 (EP,US);
B01F25/31242 (EP,US);
B01F25/31243 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/86 (EP,US);
C11D17/041 (EP,US);
C11D3/2044 (EP,US);
C11D3/2068 (EP,US);
B01F2215/0495 (EP,US);
C11D1/22 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (EP,US);
C11D1/523 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D1/75 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87611 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSTEILEN VON GEBRAUCHSFERTIGER VISKÖSER LÖSUNG SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUM AUSTEILEN | [2006/08] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING A VISCOUS USE SOLUTION AND ITS USE IN DISPENSING | [2006/08] | French: | APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR D'UNE SOLUTION VISQUEUSE DE TRAITEMENT ET SON UTILISATION A DISTRIBUER | [2006/08] |
Former [1997/48] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SPENDEN VON GEBRAUCHSFERTIGEN VISKOSEN LÖSUNGEN | ||
Former [1997/48] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING A VISCOUS USE SOLUTION | ||
Former [1997/48] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR DISTRIBUER UNE SOLUTION VISQUEUSE PRETE A L'EMPLOI | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 01.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04024151.5 / EP1500629 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.06.2006 | IT | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | DE | 29.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/06] | IT | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DE | 29.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 28.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3949903 (BENASUTTI LOUIS D, et al) [Y] 1-4,7-24,26-42,81 * column 8, line 38 - column 10, line 4 * * figure 13 * [A] 43-47,52,76,77; | [YA]WO9502664 (JEYES GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-24,26-42,82 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 12 * * examples 1,3,7 * [A] 43,51,57,59,61; | [YA]US5057246 (BERTHO ANNETTE [FR], et al) [Y] 7,8,21,22,34-36 * example 2 * [A] 49,50; | [YA]US3728129 (SARGEANT R) [Y] 11,13,14,20,23,24,28 * column 3, line 69 - column 5, line 11 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 70 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 43,53,55,56; | [Y]US5253677 (SAND WILLIAM F [US]) [Y] 12 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 8 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0595590 (DIVERSEY CORP [CA]) [Y] 16,39 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * example 5 *; | [YA]DE4213895 (S. CROCIATI) [Y] 28 * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 58 * * figure . * [A] 6; | [Y]GB2119270 (DEBRECENI MEZOEGAZDASAGI) [Y] 29 * page 1, line 125 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, line 41 - line 72 * * figures 1,3 *; | [XY]US4042151 (UTTECH RAYMOND) [X] 79,80 * column 5, line 50 - column 7, line 64 * * figures 2,4 * [Y] 81,82; | [A]US5301718 (BOLHOFNER KENNETH R [US]) [A] 1,3,13,20,33,43,45,55 * column 3, line 30 - column 6, line 61 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5259557 (SPRIGGS JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11,13,20,33,43,52,53,55,76,79 * column 9, line 49 - column 13, line 4 * * column 6, line 28 - line 31 * * figures 8,9 *; | [A]GB2097275 (BAILEY THOMAS GEORGE) [A] 1,20,33,43 * page 3, line 24 - line 117 * * figure 5 *; | [A]DE2644378 (FUELLPACK DIPL BRAUEREI ING DI) [A] 1,2,4,43,44,46 * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 1 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US3338173 (GUNZEL JR RUDOLPH M, et al) [A] 1,20,43 * column W *; | [A]US3643688 (MEINERT HARTMUT) [A] 1,20,43 * column W *; | [A]EP0109022 (MIRA LANZA SPA [IT]) [A] 7,8,21,22,34-36,49,50 * column W * | Examination | US4634559 | US4349157 | US4174812 | US3984053 | US3862640 |