EP0741865 - SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/30] |
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIESE, Karl-Hermann Strohgäustrasse 13 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | [1996/46] | Application number, filing date | 95932617.4 | 23.09.1995 | [1996/46] | WO1995DE01320 | Priority number, date | DE19944437507 | 20.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4437507 | [1996/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612947 | Date: | 02.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741865 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741865 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/407, G01N27/406 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP);
G01N27/406 (KR);
C04B41/4582 (EP);
C04B41/81 (EP);
G01N27/4075 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/00 (EP);
C04B41/4582, C04B41/5037 (EP);
C04B41/4582, C04B41/5041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/46] | Title | German: | SENSORELEMENT | [1996/46] | English: | SENSOR | [1996/46] | French: | ELEMENT DE DETECTION | [1996/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 04.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0133820 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 9 *; | [A]EP0189038 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 19 *; | [DA]DE1809622 (KENT LTD G) | Examination | EP0686847 | WO9525277 |