EP0728091 - METHOD OF MONITORING RAILWAY TRAFFIC AND RAILWAY TRACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 80 02 30 70546 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 80 02 30 D-70546 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETZEL, Andreas Triftstrasse 43 D-60528 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
SEYER, Reinhard Falkenweg 12 D-63110 Rodgau / DE | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, F. Rotdornweg 6 D-63303 Dreieich / DE | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Fröhling, Werner Otto, et al DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management Sedanstrasse 10-Geb. 17 89077 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | Fröhling, Werner Otto, Dr., et al Daimler-Benz AG, Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstr. 10/Gebäude 17 89077 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [1996/35] | Erbacher, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing. AEG Aktiengesellschaft 60591 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 95932703.2 | 09.09.1995 | [1996/35] | WO1995EP03552 | Priority number, date | DE19944432329 | 10.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4432329 | [1996/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607577 | Date: | 14.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728091 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728091 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B61L1/06, B61L23/04 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
B61L23/041 (EP);
B61L1/06 (EP);
B61L23/044 (EP);
B61L23/047 (EP);
B61L23/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUGLAUF- UND FAHRWEGÜBERWACHUNG | [1996/35] | English: | METHOD OF MONITORING RAILWAY TRAFFIC AND RAILWAY TRACKS | [1996/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE DU TRAFIC FERROVIAIRE ET DES VOIES DE CHEMINS DE FER | [1996/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE2924190 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5; | [Y]DE3815152 (STRABAG BAU AG [DE]) [Y] 2,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3844663 (STRABAG BAU AG [DE]) [A] 2,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5330136 (COLBAUGH MICHAEL E [US]) [A] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 44 - column 8, line 20; figures 1-12 * |