EP0778939 - ADVANCED SYNCHRONOUS LUMINESCENCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UT-Battelle, LLC 111-B Union Valley Road Oak Ridge, Tennessee 37831-6498 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states UT-BATTELLE, LLC 111-B Union Valley Road Oak Ridge, Tennessee 37831-6498 / US | ||
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states LOCKHEED MARTIN ENERGY SYSTEMS, INC. P.O. Box 2009 Oak Ridge, TN 37831-8243 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VO-DINH, Tuan 12318 River Oaks Point Knoxville, TN 37922 / US | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Pratt, Richard Wilson D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95933028.3 | 01.09.1995 | [1997/25] | WO1995US11168 | Priority number, date | US19940300202 | 02.09.1994 Original published format: US 300202 | [1997/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607889 | Date: | 14.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0778939 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N33/48, A61B5/00, G01J3/443 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
G01N21/6402 (EP,US);
G01N21/64 (KR);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
G01J3/1256 (EP,US);
G01N21/6456 (EP,US);
G01N21/6486 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/25] | G01N21/64, G01N33/48, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1997/25] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES SYSTEM ZUR SYNCHRONEN LUMINISZENZ | [1997/25] | English: | ADVANCED SYNCHRONOUS LUMINESCENCE SYSTEM | [1997/25] | French: | SYSTEME EVOLUE A LUMINESCENCE SYNCHRONE | [1997/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 10.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/25] | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/28] | 14.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2005 | 30.09.2005 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3734621 (MOODY R, et al) [A] 7,8,15-18 * abstract *; | [A] - W.DEMTRÖDER, Laserspektroskopie. Grundlagen und Techniken. 3. Auflage, BERLIN, DE, SPRINGER, (1993), XP002108324 [A] 5,6,12,14 * page 214 - page 216 * | International search | [A]US4930516 (ALFANO ROBERT R [US], et al) | [A] - LASERS IN SURGERY AND MEDICINE, Volume 11, issued 1991, J. HUNG et al., "Autofluorescence of Normal and Malignant Bronchial Tissue", pages 99-105. | [A] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, Volume 176, No. 3, issued 15 May 1991, M. RAO, "Synchronous Scan Fluorescence Spectroscopy of Proteins and Hyman Eye Lenses", pages 1351-1357. | [A] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., Volume 85, issued December 1988, D.K. MANCHESTER et al., "Detection of Benzo[a]Pyrene Diol Epoxide-DNA Adducts in Human Placenta", pages 9243-9247. |