EP0752819 - WORK CLOTHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmidt, Wolfgang Kampstrasse 1 21447 Handorf / DE | [1997/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/04] |
Former [1997/05] | Heldt, Gert, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Neuer Wall 59 III 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95933374.1 | 15.09.1995 | [1997/03] | WO1995EP03631 | Priority number, date | DE19944442290 | 28.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4442290 | [1997/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616561 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752819 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/00 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
A41D13/02 (EP);
A41D13/00 (EP);
A41D2400/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/03] | Title | German: | ARBEITSBEKLEIDUNG | [1997/03] | English: | WORK CLOTHING | [1997/03] | French: | VETEMENT DE TRAVAIL | [1997/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 19.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.09.1996 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | 09.09.1996 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.09.1996 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.1997 | 30.09.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3820716 (SCHMIDT) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,12-15,21 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 16 - line 30 * * column 3, line 1 - line 23; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4101559 (RICHTER) [X] 1,2,5,25,26 * column 1, line 26 - line 39 * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 2 *; | [X]FR2655822 (CHATEAU) [X] 1,2,15,16,21,22 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 7; figure 1; claims 1-3,6 *; | [A]US4999850 (GRILLIOT ET AL.) [A] 1,6,7 * column 4, line 41 - line 48 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 29; figures 4,8 *; | [A]US1440241 (POLLACK) [A] 1,2,19 * figure 2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US1777620 (MODESITT) [A] 1,2,24 * figures 3,4,7; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE9401183U (LUXI) [A] 1,6-8,10,16,22 * claims 1-12 * |