EP0786097 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE ELECTRO-OPTICAL MEASUREMENT OF DISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica AG Postfach 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [1997/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÄCHTER, Bernhard Kapfstrasse 4b CH-9436 Balgach / CH | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Stamer, Harald c/o Leica Industrieverwaltung GmbH Konzernstelle Patente + Marken Postfach 20 20 35530 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Stamer, Harald, Dipl.-Phys. c/o Leica Industrieverwaltung GmbH, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Postfach 20 20 35530 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 95933410.3 | 21.09.1995 | [1997/31] | WO1995EP03712 | Priority number, date | DE19944436447 | 13.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4436447 | [1997/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612203 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786097 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786097 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/10 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
G01S17/10 (EP,US);
G01S7/483 (EP,US);
G01S7/484 (EP,US);
G01S7/487 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTROOPTISCHEN ENTFERNUNGSMESSUNG | [1997/31] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE ELECTRO-OPTICAL MEASUREMENT OF DISTANCE | [1997/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE ELECTRO-OPTIQUE DE DISTANCE | [1997/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.03.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 05.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO8805922 (WILD HEERBRUGG AG [CH]) [AD] 1,2,8 * page 4 - page 8; figure - *; | [A]EP0437417 (OPTAB OPTRONIKINNOVATION AB [SE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]DE4031668 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 57; figure - * |