EP0733529 - CENTERS FOR THE WASHING OF MACHINERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOMEZ DE SEBASTIAN, Fernando Llaceras, 16 08190 Sant Cugat del Vallès / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states Comez de Sebastian, Fernando Llaceras, 16 08190 Sant Cugat del Vallès / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Maldonado Jordan, Julia Linares, 7 - 3 46018 Valencia / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Maldonado Jordan, Julia Linares, 7 Pta. 3 46018 Valencia / ES | ||
Former [1996/39] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Delhaye, BP 30, rue du Centre 81370 St Sulpice / FR | Application number, filing date | 95933440.0 | 06.10.1995 | [1996/39] | WO1995ES00110 | Priority number, date | ES19940002094 | 06.10.1994 Original published format: ES 9402094 | [1996/39] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9611127 | Date: | 18.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733529 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733529 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60S3/04 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
B60S3/044 (EP,US);
G07F17/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/39] | Title | German: | WASCHANLAGE FÜR MASCHINENREINIGUNG | [1996/39] | English: | CENTERS FOR THE WASHING OF MACHINERY | [1996/39] | French: | CENTRES DE LAVAGE DE MACHINES | [1996/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1996 | Translation filed | 20.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 28.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.11.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   25.11.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE1455518U (KOPAT) [Y] 1-8,11,12,15,16 * the whole document *; | [Y]CH456365 (ALD INC [US]) [Y] 1,9,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2137149 (PANDION HALIAETUS LIMITED) [Y] 1,13,14* the whole document *; | [YA]DE3814726 (WAP REINIGUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * [A] 17-28,34-38,41,42,44-48 |