EP0843582 - GOLF CLUB AND CLUB SHAFT CONSTRUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Billings, David P. 5024 Tracy Dallas, TX 75205 / US | [1998/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95933808.8 | 20.07.1995 | [1998/22] | WO1995US11685 | Priority number, date | US19940277680 | 20.07.1994 Original published format: US 277680 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9602301 | Date: | 01.02.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843582 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63B53/00, A63B53/10 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
A63B53/10 (EP,US);
A63B53/007 (US);
A63B53/02 (EP);
A63B53/12 (EP);
A63B53/14 (US);
A63B2209/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/22] | A63B53/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [1998/22] | Title | German: | GOLFSCHLÄGER UND KONSTRUKTION DES SCHAFTS | [1998/22] | English: | GOLF CLUB AND CLUB SHAFT CONSTRUCTIONS | [1998/22] | French: | BATON DE GOLF ET STRUCTURES DE MANCHE DE BATON DE GOLF | [1998/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.1997 | Search fee paid | 20.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.02.1997 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 06.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 20.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/02] | 05.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/02] | Request for further processing for: | 25.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.03.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5328174 (REEDER ROBERT P [US]) [A] 1,3-7,9,13,14 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]US5093162 (FENTON FRANK [US], et al) [DA] 3-8,12 * column 3, line 30 - line 60; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0370530 (MILIVOJEVIC DEJAN DR) [A] 3-6 * figures 1-5 *; | [DA]US4067573 (KEY JR JACK B) [DA] 8 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4000902 (PERKINS SONNIE JOSEPH) [A] 16 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO8704634 (SCORPION HUMAN PERFORMANCE SYS [AU]) | International search | [X]US4682762 (LEKAVICH CARL W [US]); | [Y]US4330126 (RUMBLE JOSEPH W); | [Y]US5310189 (SOTO JORGE [US]); | [Y]US5255919 (JOHNSON ALEXANDER T [AU]); | [Y]US5253868 (BAUMANN PETER E [US], et al); | [Y]US4272077 (SPIVEY ALICE C) | [Y] - PETERSEN'S GOLFING, June 1994, Advertisement for PROBE, pages 30-31. |