EP0782515 - AUTOMOBILE AIR BAG SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Safety Concepts, Inc. Suite E-12, 1570 Pacheco Street Santa Fe, NM 87505 / US | [2002/09] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states Advanced Safety Concepts, Inc. P.O. Box 2534 Santa Fe, NM 87504 / US | ||
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states Kithil, Philip W. 1274 Vallecita Drive Santa Fe, NM 87501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kithil, Philip W. 1274 Vallecita Drive Santa Fe, NM 87501 / US | [1998/03] |
Former [1997/28] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kupecz, Arpad Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | Kupecz, Arpad Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. Postbox 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 95933901.1 | 22.09.1995 | [1997/28] | WO1995US12077 | Priority number, date | US19940311576 | 23.09.1994 Original published format: US 311576 | [1997/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9609193 | Date: | 28.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782515 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782515 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/32, B60R21/00 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
B60R21/013 (EP,US);
B60N2/002 (US);
B60N2/0027 (EP);
B60N2/0028 (EP);
B60N2/0029 (EP);
B60N2/0035 (EP);
B60R21/01532 (EP,US);
B60R21/213 (EP,US);
B60R21/233 (EP,US);
B60N2/266 (EP);
B60N2210/12 (EP);
B60N2220/10 (EP);
B60N2230/30 (EP);
B60R2021/01006 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01306 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/28] | B60R21/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/28] | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUG-LUFTSACKSYSTEM | [1997/28] | English: | AUTOMOBILE AIR BAG SYSTEM | [1997/28] | French: | SYSTEME DE COUSSIN GONFLABLE POUR AUTOMOBILE | [1997/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 23.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 12.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 17.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4112579 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [XA]DE4023109 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [XA]DE4341500 (TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS [US]) | International search | [A]US4620721 (SCHOLZ HANSJUERGEN [DE], et al); | [A]US4625329 (ISHIKAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4985835 (STERLER GEORG [DE], et al); | [A]US5071160 (WHITE CRAIG W [US], et al); | [A]US5118134 (MATTES BERNHARD [DE], et al); | [A]US5256904 (TOHBARU SHIGEO [JP]); | [Y]US5261506 (JOST MICHAEL [DE]); | [A]US5291014 (BREDE UWE [DE], et al); | [XP]US5366241 (KITHIL PHILIP W [US]) |