EP0784584 - SUPPORTING APPARATUS FOR A CONVEYOR BELT AND DUMPING POINT AND SELF-DISCHARGING TRANSPORT SHIP COMPRISING SUCH APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.E.A.M. STOKMAN HOLDING B.V. Smijershof 3 4941 WS Raamsdonksveer / NL | [1997/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOKMAN, Johannes, Everardus, Antonius, Maria Smijershof 3 NL-4941 WS Raamsdonksveer / NL | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 95934342.7 | 03.10.1995 | [1997/30] | WO1995NL00332 | Priority number, date | NL19940001624 | 03.10.1994 Original published format: NL 9401624 | [1997/30] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9610529 | Date: | 11.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0784584 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0784584 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65G39/16, B65G19/08, B65G15/62, B65G39/12 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
B65G39/12 (EP,US);
B65G15/62 (EP,US);
B65G19/08 (EP,US);
B65G39/16 (EP,US);
B65G2201/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1997/30] | Title | German: | FÖRDER-BANDTRAGVORRICHTUNG MIT ABGABESTATION UND SELBSTENTLADENDES SCHIFF MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [1997/30] | English: | SUPPORTING APPARATUS FOR A CONVEYOR BELT AND DUMPING POINT AND SELF-DISCHARGING TRANSPORT SHIP COMPRISING SUCH APPARATUS | [1997/30] | French: | APPAREIL PORTEUR POUR BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE, ET POINT DE DECHARGEMENT ET NAVIRE DE TRANSPORT A DECHARGEMENT AUTONOME COMPORTANT CET APPAREIL | [1997/30] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.1996 | Translation filed | 03.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 13.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3200940 (ARTHUR HIGGINS BERNARD); | [A]US3212626 (MCLEISH WILLIAM A, et al); | [A]US3880275 (FISCHER HANS, et al) [A] * column 3, line 43 - line 49; figure 5 *; | [X]DE3643512 (PHB WESERHUETTE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,12,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5350053 (ARCHER NEIL [US]) |