EP0781472 - MULTIPURPOSE ERROR CORRECTION CALCULATION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIRRUS LOGIC, INC. 3100 West Warren Avenue Fremont California 94538 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states CIRRUS LOGIC, INC. 3100 West Warren Avenue Fremont, California 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOOK, Christopher, P. 8901 Sage Valley Road Longmont, CO 80503 / US | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95934496.1 | 15.09.1995 | [1997/27] | WO1995US12087 | Priority number, date | US19940306918 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: US 306918 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9608875 | Date: | 21.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0781472 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0781472 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
G06F7/726 (EP,US);
H03M13/00 (EP,KR,US);
G06F11/10 (EP,US);
G06F11/1004 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
H03M13/15 (EP,US);
H03M13/151 (EP,US);
H03M13/35 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/17] |
Former [1997/27] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL | Title | German: | MEHRZWECKBERECHNUNGSSCHALTUNG ZUR FEHLERKORREKTUR | [1997/27] | English: | MULTIPURPOSE ERROR CORRECTION CALCULATION CIRCUIT | [1997/27] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CALCUL DE CORRECTION D'ERREURS A USAGES MULTIPLES | [1997/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 11.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.03.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06278920 ; | [A]JPH0653843 ; | [A]EP0096165 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-81 * page 12, line 34 - page 26, line 33; figure - *; | [A]WO9101598 (ITALTEL SPA [IT]) [A] 1,21,34,41,50,60-62,71,78 * page 10, line 1 - page 13, line 32; figure - *; | [A]US4994995 (ANDERSON ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1,21,34,41,50,60-62,71,78 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 59; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870910), vol. 11, no. 280, Database accession no. (E - 539), & JP6278920 A 19870411 (HITACHI) [A] 1-81 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940527), vol. 10, no. 280, Database accession no. (E - 1555), & JP653843 A 19940225 (NEC) [A] 1,21,34,41,50,60-62,71,78 * abstract * |