EP0746820 - Circuit for Coupling Data Communication Busses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/50] | CIRCUIT COMPRISING A DATA COMMUNICATION BUS | ||
[2000/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUTTE, Herman Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/50] | de Haas, Laurens Johan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95934797.2 | 08.11.1995 | [1996/50] | WO1995IB00975 | Priority number, date | EP19940203510 | 02.12.1994 Original published format: EP 94203510 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9617305 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746820 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0746820 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G06F1/32 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
G06F13/4072 (EP,US);
G06F13/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/50] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Kopplung von Kommunikations-Bussen | [2000/24] | English: | Circuit for Coupling Data Communication Busses | [2000/24] | French: | Circuit à Relier des Bus de Transmission | [2000/24] |
Former [1996/50] | SCHALTUNG MIT EINEM DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSBUS | ||
Former [1996/50] | CIRCUIT COMPRISING A DATA COMMUNICATION BUS | ||
Former [1996/50] | CIRCUIT COMPORTANT UN BUS DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 31.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.03.2002 | [2004/04] | Cited in | International search | [A]JP1224819 ; | [A]US3832489 (KRISHNA R); | [A]FR2676559 (MATRA DEFENSE [FR]); | [A]EP0549165 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 13, No. 543, P-970; & JP,A,1 224 819 (HITACHI LTD), 7 Sept 1989., & JP1224819 A 00000000 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Volume 26, No. 12, May 1984, (Armonk, New York, USA), T. YANAGI, "Bus Extension System", page 6481 - page 6483. |