EP0783479 - CONVERSION OF NYLON 6 AND/OR NYLON 6,6 TO ADIPIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORAN, Edward, Francis, Jr. 20 Storrie Avenue Gibbstown, NJ 08027-1149 / US | 02 /
MCKINNEY, Ronald, James 1243 Lakewood Drive Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1997/29] | Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95934987.9 | 22.09.1995 | [1997/29] | WO1995US11776 | Priority number, date | US19940314744 | 29.09.1994 Original published format: US 314744 | [1997/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9610008 | Date: | 04.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783479 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783479 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C55/14, C07C51/16, C07D201/12 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
C07C231/14 (EP,US);
C07C51/16 (KR);
C07C51/21 (EP,US);
C07C55/14 (KR);
C07D201/12 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/21, C07C55/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/29] | Title | German: | KONVERSION VON NYLON UND/ODER NYLON 6,6 ZUR ADIPINSÄURE | [1997/29] | English: | CONVERSION OF NYLON 6 AND/OR NYLON 6,6 TO ADIPIC ACID | [1997/29] | French: | CONVERSION DE NYLON 6 ET/OU DE DE NYLON 6,6 EN ACIDE ADIPIQUE | [1997/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US5310905 (MORAN JR EDWARD F [US]) [DX] 1-3,6-8,11-13 * ENTIRE DOCUMENT. *; | [A]DE910056 (BASF AG) [A] 1,6,11 * page 2, line 22 - line 26 * * page 2; example 2 * * claim 1 * |