EP0775270 - HYDRAULICALLY-OPERABLE LOCKING DIFFERENTIAL WITH IN-LINE PISTON MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tractech Inc. 11445 Stephens Drive Warren Michigan 48090 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Tractech Inc. 11445 Stephens Drive Warren, Michigan 48090 / US | ||
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states TITAN WHEEL INTERNATIONAL, INC. 2701 Spruce Street Quincy, IL 62302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DISSETT, Walter, L. 30767 Misty Pines Drive Farmington Hills, MI 48336 / US | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95935022.4 | 28.09.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US11968 | Priority number, date | US19950482846 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 482846 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641089 | Date: | 19.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/55] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775270 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775270 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H48/22 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
F16H48/22 (EP,US);
F16H48/24 (EP,US);
F16H48/30 (EP,US);
F16H48/34 (EP,US);
F16H2048/204 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2071 (EP,US);
F16H48/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT [1997/22] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCH BETÄTIGBARES SPERRDIFFERENZIAL MIT KOAXIAL ZUGEORDNETEM KOLBEN | [1997/22] | English: | HYDRAULICALLY-OPERABLE LOCKING DIFFERENTIAL WITH IN-LINE PISTON MEANS | [1997/22] | French: | DIFFERENTIEL BLOCABLE HYDRAULIQUEMENT AVEC PISTON ALIGNE | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1996 | Search fee paid | 27.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3974717 (BREED MICHAL A, et al); | [A]US4790404 (NAITO GENPEI [JP]); | [A]US5152362 (NAITO GENPEI [JP]); | [A]US5161636 (HAUPT JOSEF [DE], et al); | [A]US5133696 (KOBAYASHI TOSHIO [JP]); | [A]US5172787 (KOBAYASHI TOSHIO [JP]); | [A]US5295921 (IPPOLITO LUIGI [IT], et al); | [AP]US5445574 (SEKIGUCHI SHINICHI [JP], et al) |