EP0787301 - ESTIMATION OF THE FRAGMENTATION PATTERN OF COLLAGEN IN BODY FLUIDS AND THE DIAGNOSIS OF DISORDERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE METABOLISM OF COLLAGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osteometer Biotech AS Osteopark, Herlev Hovedgade 207 2730 Herlev / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states Osteometer Biotech AS Osteopark, Herlev Hovedgade 207 2730 Herlev / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONDE, Martin Lystoftevej 28 DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | 02 /
QVIST, Per Taarbaek Strandvej 103G DK-2930 Klampenborg / DK | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Smart, Peter John W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95935451.5 | 16.10.1995 | [1997/32] | WO1995EP04055 | Priority number, date | DK19940001194 | 17.10.1994 Original published format: DK 119494 | GB19950006050 | 24.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9506050 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612193 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787301 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0787301 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C07K7/06 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
G01N33/6887 (EP,US);
G01N2800/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/32] | Title | German: | EINSCHÄTZUNG DER FRAGMENTIERUNGSMUSTER VON KOLLAGEN IN KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEITEN UND DIAGNOSE VON MIT DEM KOLLAGENMETABOLISMUS ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDEN STÖRUNGEN | [1997/32] | English: | ESTIMATION OF THE FRAGMENTATION PATTERN OF COLLAGEN IN BODY FLUIDS AND THE DIAGNOSIS OF DISORDERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE METABOLISM OF COLLAGEN | [1997/32] | French: | EVALUATION DU SCHEMA DE FRAGMENTATION DU COLLAGENE DANS DES FLUIDES CORPORELS ET DIAGNOSTIC DES TROUBLES ASSOCIES AU METABOLISME DU COLLAGENE | [1997/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 07.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.02.2001 | DK | 14.05.2001 | PT | 14.05.2001 | GR | 18.05.2001 | LU | 16.10.2001 | MC | 16.10.2001 | [2005/23] |
Former [2004/51] | SE | 14.02.2001 | |
DK | 14.05.2001 | ||
PT | 14.05.2001 | ||
GR | 18.05.2001 | ||
MC | 16.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | SE | 14.02.2001 | |
DK | 14.05.2001 | ||
PT | 14.05.2001 | ||
MC | 16.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/31] | SE | 14.02.2001 | |
PT | 14.05.2001 | ||
MC | 16.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/43] | PT | 14.05.2001 | |
MC | 16.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | PT | 14.05.2001 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO8904491 (WASHINGTON RES FOUND [US]); | EP0394296 [ ] (WASHINGTON RES FOUND [US]); | [DA]EP0505210 (ORION YHTYMAE OY [FI]); | [A]WO9221698 (WASHINGTON RES FOUND [US]); | [DA]DE4225038 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | WO9403813 [ ] (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO9414844 (BAYLINK DAVID J [US]); | [DPX]WO9508115 (OSTEOMETER A S [DK], et al) [DPX] 1-5* the whole document * | [DA] - J. A. LAST ET AL., "Biosynthesis of collagen crosslinks", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 22, no. 5, pages 559 - 564 |