EP0737357 - SILVER ALLOY CONTAINING INDIUM AND CADMIUM FOR MAKING NEUTRON-ABSORBING ELEMENTS, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | For all designated states COGEMA 2, rue Paul Dautier F-78141 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | [1996/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEFOORT, Françoise 27, chemin de la Côte F-38640 Claix / FR | 02 /
PILLET, Luc 79, rue Paul-Bert F-69003 Lyon / FR | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95935497.8 | 13.10.1995 | [1996/42] | WO1995FR01356 | Priority number, date | FR19940013085 | 02.11.1994 Original published format: FR 9413085 | [1996/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614639 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737357 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737357 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G21C7/24 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
G21C7/24 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1999/44] |
Former [1996/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | INDIUM- UND CADMIUMHALTIGE SILBERLEGIERUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON NEUTRONENABSORBIERENDEN ELEMENTEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [1996/42] | English: | SILVER ALLOY CONTAINING INDIUM AND CADMIUM FOR MAKING NEUTRON-ABSORBING ELEMENTS, AND USE THEREOF | [1996/42] | French: | ALLIAGE A BASE D'ARGENT RENFERMANT DE L'INDIUM ET DU CADMIUM POUR LA REALISATION D'ELEMENTS ABSORBANT LES NEUTRONS ET UTILISATION | [1996/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.05.2000 | GB | 10.05.2000 | SE | 10.08.2000 | DE | 11.08.2000 | [2002/26] |
Former [2002/13] | GB | 10.05.2000 | |
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
DE | 11.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | GB | 10.05.2000 | |
SE | 10.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | GB | 10.05.2000 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US3074871 (BENJAMIN LUSTMAN, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 26 * * table I, alliage n 7; table III, exemple n 1; table IV, exemple n 1 * [A] 2,9 [Y] 3-5; | [YA]JPH03261894 ; | [A]US3923502 (PORTNOI KIM ISAEVICH, et al) [A] 1,2 * column A * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920219), vol. 16, no. 68, Database accession no. (P - 1314), & JP03261894 A 19911121 (MITSUBISHI ATOM POWER IND) [Y] 3-5 * abstract * [A] 6,7 |