EP0789737 - MULCH OR SEED MAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stevens, Ian Lawrence Lot 4, Old Bogangar Road Cudgen, NSW 2487 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states Stevens, Ian Lawrence Lot 4, Old Bogangar Road Cudgen, NSW 2487 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Mosey, Stephen George, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Mosey, Stephen George, et al MARKS & CLERK Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95935760.9 | 30.10.1995 | [1997/34] | WO1995AU00720 | Priority number, date | AU1994PM09076 | 28.10.1994 Original published format: AU PM907694 | AU1915PM00161 | 29.03.1995 Original published format: AU PM016115 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9613560 | Date: | 09.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789737 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789737 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09K17/52, A01C1/04, A01G1/00, A01G13/02, A01G13/10, D21J3/12 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
C09K17/52 (EP,US);
A01C1/044 (EP,US);
Y02A40/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | MULCH- ODER SAMENTEPPICH | [1997/34] | English: | MULCH OR SEED MAT | [1997/34] | French: | TAPIS DE PAILLAGE OU D'ENSEMENCEMENT | [1997/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 19.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 19.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 23.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]DE2829324 (DOERING ERICH); | [X]AU5218979 (EDET AB); | [A]US4414776 (BALL HARRY J [US]); | [X]GB2170795 (MONTJOIE RUDOLF ANTHONY DE); | [A]US5207020 (ASLAM M SOHAIL [US], et al); | [AP]AU6475694 (ROBERT CHARLES) | [X] - ENCYCLOPAEDIA BRITANNICA, Volume 17, "Papier - Mache", Published 1961, by WILLIAM BENTON, pages 238A-238B. | Examination | GB1574006 | WO9208588 |