EP0799142 - WINDSHIELD WIPER ASSEMBLY WITH A NOISE- AND VIBRATION-DAMPING FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [1997/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEL, Oliver Kirchgasse 13 D-71706 Markgröningen / DE | 02 /
ORTALE, Alessandro Helmbundweg 8 D-74243 Langenbrettach / DE | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/09] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | Jahn, Wolf-Diethart Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Guerickestra e 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 95935942.3 | 17.10.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995EP04069 | Priority number, date | DE19944446315 | 23.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4446315 | [1997/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620101 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799142 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799142 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/04 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
F16F1/3732 (EP,US);
B60S1/04 (EP,US);
B60S1/0444 (EP,US);
B60S1/0425 (EP,US);
B60S1/0433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/41] | Title | German: | SCHEIBENWISCHERANLAGE MIT EINEM GERÄUSCH- BZW. SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFENDEN BEFESTIGUNGSMITTEL | [1997/41] | English: | WINDSHIELD WIPER ASSEMBLY WITH A NOISE- AND VIBRATION-DAMPING FASTENER | [1997/41] | French: | SYSTEME D'ESSUIE-GLACES POURVU D'UN ELEMENT DE FIXATION AMORTISSANT LE BRUIT ET LES VIBRATIONS | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 15.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE4036367 (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,11 * column 2, line 47 - line 57 * * column 3, line 2 - line 12 * * column 3, line 23 - line 38 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2237516 (HAHN FAHRZEUGBAU GMBH) [A] 1,10 * page 4, line 4 - page 6, line L; figure - * |