EP0795562 - NOVEL OXYNTOMODULIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. Ohtemachi Bldg., 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. Ohtemachi Bldg., 6-1, Ohtemachi I-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANO, Keiichi 2625, Ohzenji Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 215 / JP | 02 /
YAMASAKI, Motoo 3-9-13, Naka-machi Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | 03 /
MORIYAMA, Takahiro 410-1-308, Nameri Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411 / JP | 04 /
ANDO, Masaaki 3248-157, Kodani Takaya-cho Higashi-Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 739-21 / JP | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95936110.6 | 07.11.1995 | [1997/38] | WO1995JP02269 | Priority number, date | JP19940272069 | 07.11.1994 Original published format: JP 27206994 | [1997/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614336 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0795562 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/575, A61K38/22 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/38] | Title | German: | NEUES OXYNTOMODULIN | [1997/38] | English: | NOVEL OXYNTOMODULIN | [1997/38] | French: | NOUVELLE OXYNTOMODULINE | [1997/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1997 | Translation filed | 13.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 13.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 08.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/43] | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A] - GENERAL AND COMPARATIVE ENDOCRINOLOGY, Vol. 72, p. 181-189, (1988). | [A] - J. BIOL. CHEM., Vol. 263, No. 20, p. 9746-9751, (1988). |