EP0787145 - NOVEL TNF RECEPTOR DEATH DOMAIN LIGAND PROTEINS AND INHIBITORS OF LIGAND BINDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genetics Institute, LLC 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | [2002/26] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states GENETICS INSTITUTE, INC. 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Lih-Ling 107 College Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Jennifer 833 West Roxbury Parkway Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | 03 /
SCHIEVELLA, Andrea, R. 39 Edward Street Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 04 /
GRAHAM, James 28 Foskett Street Somerville, MA 02144 / US | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95936246.8 | 12.10.1995 | [1997/32] | WO1995US12724 | Priority number, date | US19940327514 | 19.10.1994 Original published format: US 327514 | US19950494440 | 19.06.1995 Original published format: US 494440 | US19950533901 | 26.09.1995 Original published format: US 533901 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612735 | Date: | 02.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787145 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C07K16/24 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/4743 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K16/24 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/32] | Title | German: | NEUE PROTEINE, DIE DIE TODSTRECKE DES TNF-REZEPTORS BINDEN | [1997/32] | English: | NOVEL TNF RECEPTOR DEATH DOMAIN LIGAND PROTEINS AND INHIBITORS OF LIGAND BINDING | [1997/32] | French: | NOUVEAUX LIGANDS PROTEIQUES AU DOMAINE DE MORT DU RECEPTEUR DU TNF ET INHIBITEURS DE FIXATION DES LIGANDS | [1997/32] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/30] | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9401548 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-8,26-28,35 * see sequence 494 and passim *; | [X]WO9410207 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [X] 1,11,13-17,19-28 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9214834 (WHITTIER INST DIABETES & ENDOC [US]) [X] 1,11,13-17,19-28 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9203471 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [X] 1,11,13-17,19-28 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9203470 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [X] 1,11,13-17,19-28 * the whole document * | [X] - M ROTHE ET AL., "A novel family of putative signal transducers associated with the cytoplasmic domain of the 75 kDa tumor necrosis factor receptor", CELL, NA US, (19940826), vol. 78, pages 681 - 692 [X] 1,4-8 * the whole document * | [X] - H Y SONG ET AL., "Aggregation of the intracellular domain of the type 1 tumor necrosis factor receptor defined by the two-hybrid system", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19940809), vol. 269, no. 36, pages 22492 - 22495 [X] 1,4-8 * the whole document * | [AD] - L A TARTAGLIA ET AL., "A novel domain within the 55 kD TNF receptor signals cell death", CELL, NA US, (19930910), vol. 74, no. 8, pages 845 - 853 [AD] 1 * the whole document * | [PX] - M P BOLDIN ET AL., "Self-association of the "Death-Domains" of the p55 Tumor Necrosis factor (TNF) receptor and Fas/Apo1 prompts signalling for TNF and Fas/Apo1 effects", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19950106), vol. 270, no. 1, pages 387 - 391 [PX] 1 * the whole document * | [PX] - H HSU ET AL., "The TNF receptor 1-associated protein TRADD signals cell death and NF-kappaB association", CELL, NA US, (19950519), vol. 81, pages 495 - 504 [PX] 1 * the whole document * | [PX] - M P BOLDIN ET AL., "A protein related to a proteasome subunit binds to the intracellular domain of the p55 TNF receptor upstream to its "death domain"", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 367, pages 39 - 44 [PX] 1 * the whole document * | [PX] - MMY WAYE ET AL., "Gene expression of adult human heart as revealed by random sequencing of cDNA library", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, ENGLAND GB, vol. 8 supplement, page 90 [PX] 1 * the whole document * | [XP] - C AUFFRAY ET AL., "IMAGE: intégration au niveau moléculaire de l'analyse du génome humain et de son expression", COMPTES RENDUS DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES SERIE III: SCIENCES DE LA VIE., MONTREUIL FR, vol. 318, pages 263 - 272 [XP] 1 * the whole document * |