EP0795249 - SIGNAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marconi Electronic Systems Limited The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Marconi Electronic Systems Limited The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | ||
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McEWEN, Robert, Kennedy 20 The Swallows Billericay Essex CM11 2RJ / GB | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Fitchett, Stuart Paul, et al Marconi Intellectual Property, Marrable House, The Vineyards, Gt. Baddow Chelmsford, Essex CM2 7QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul, et al GEC Patent Department, Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95937113.9 | 24.11.1995 | [1997/38] | WO1995GB02755 | Priority number, date | GB19940024028 | 29.11.1994 Original published format: GB 9424028 | [1997/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9617471 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0795249 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0795249 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/217 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
H04N25/671 (EP,US);
H04N5/33 (US);
H04N23/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1997/38] | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNG | [1997/38] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING | [1997/38] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX | [1997/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 02.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0138579 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]); | [X]FR2569510 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [Y]GB2195855 (PLESSEY CO PLC); | [A]WO9009076 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [XY]EP0554802 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]WO9323952 (REGAM MEDICAL SYSTEMS AB [SE], et al) |