EP0805959 - METHOD FOR DETERMINATION OF FLOW RATE IN A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUDMUNDSSON, Jon Steinar Alfheimsvingen 4 7022 Trondheim / NO | [1997/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Dealtry, Brian, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95938073.4 | 09.11.1995 | [1997/46] | WO1995NO00211 | Priority number, date | NO19940004264 | 09.11.1994 Original published format: NO 944264 | [1997/46] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9615427 | Date: | 23.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0805959 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805959 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/34, G01F1/66, G01F1/74, G01F1/76, G01P5/14, G01P5/18 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
G01F1/66 (EP,US);
G01F1/36 (EP,US);
G01F1/74 (EP,US);
G01P5/14 (EP,US);
G01P5/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES DURCHFLUSSES EINES FLUIDS | [1997/46] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINATION OF FLOW RATE IN A FLUID | [1997/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DU DEBIT D'UN FLUIDE | [1997/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.1995 | Translation filed | 09.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 09.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 17.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 24.03.2004 | CH | 24.03.2004 | LI | 24.03.2004 | GR | 24.06.2004 | SE | 24.06.2004 | ES | 05.07.2004 | PT | 24.08.2004 | IE | 09.11.2004 | LU | 09.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | BE | 24.03.2004 | |
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
IE | 09.11.2004 | ||
LU | 09.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BE | 24.03.2004 | |
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
IE | 09.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BE | 24.03.2004 | |
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | BE | 24.03.2004 | |
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | BE | 24.03.2004 | |
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 24.03.2004 | |
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 24.06.2004 | |
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 24.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]SU938023 ; | [X]US3523454 (RUSNAK JEROME J); | [A]US4312234 (RHODES E, et al); | [A]US4364413 (BERSIN RICHARD L, et al); | [X]FI853631L (RAIMO PARKKINEN OY [FI]); | [Y]WO9005283 (DELSING JERKER [SE]); | [A]US5099697 (AGAR JORAM [KY]); | [Y]WO9314382 (GUDMUNDSSON JON STEINAR [NO]) | [X] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. G0253K/18, week 8318; & SU,A,938 023 (GIDROPROEKT RES INST), 25 June 1982., & SU938023 A 00000000 |