EP0792505 - VOLTAGE SUPPLIES FOR FLASH MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAVANIFARD, Jahanshir, J. 4115 Crondall Drive Sacramento, CA 95864 / US | 02 /
MEISTER, Kimberley, D. 100 Donegan Court Folsom, CA 95630 / US | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95938246.6 | 18.10.1995 | [1997/36] | WO1995US13235 | Priority number, date | US19940326702 | 19.10.1994 Original published format: US 326702 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9613037 | Date: | 02.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0792505 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0792505 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/14, G11C16/06 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
G11C16/30 (EP,US);
G11C5/143 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | G11C13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/36] | Title | German: | SPANNUNGSVERSORGUNGEN FÜR FLASH-SPEICHER | [1997/36] | English: | VOLTAGE SUPPLIES FOR FLASH MEMORY | [1997/36] | French: | ALIMENTATIONS EN TENSIONS POUR MEMOIRES FLASH | [1997/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 12.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 24.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/48] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/52] | 11.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/52] | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Request for further processing for: | 17.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.07.2001 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US5444664 (KURODA KENICHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2 * column A * * column 3, line 10 - line 24 * * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 51 * * column 15, line 67 - column 17, line 4 * * figures 1,16-18 * * claims 5,6 *; | [A]US5172342 (GOCHI HIDENOBU [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 27 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 9 * * figure 5A * | International search | [A]US5041739 (GOTO HIROYUKI [JP]) |