EP0783435 - ICE CREAM SANDWICH COLLATOR SUB-ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERBAKE FOODS, INC. 2821 Emerywood Parkway Richmond, VA 23294-3727 / US | [1997/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENNEDY, Cory, R. 634 Brookshire Drive Richmond, VA 23234 / US | 02 /
GRUBZAK, Yancey 6201 West Patterson Avenue Richmond, VA 23236 / US | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95938743.2 | 06.10.1995 | [1997/29] | WO1995US13187 | Priority number, date | US19940318922 | 06.10.1994 Original published format: US 318922 | [1997/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9611139 | Date: | 18.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783435 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783435 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65B35/50 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
B65B25/007 (EP,US);
B65B35/50 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/29] | Extension states | LT | 02.05.1997 | LV | 02.05.1997 | SI | 02.05.1997 | Title | German: | BAUGRUPPEN ZUM ZUSAMMENFÜHREN VON SPEISEEISSANDWICHES | [1997/29] | English: | ICE CREAM SANDWICH COLLATOR SUB-ASSEMBLY | [1997/29] | French: | SOUS-ENSEMBLE DE MISE EN PILE DE SANDWICHS GLACES | [1997/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 27.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB936460 (UNILEVER LTD) [X] 1,16 * page 2, lines 13-124; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,5,6,8,9,17,20,21,23,24; | [X]DE1970461U (SANDOZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,16 * figures 1-3; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0160825 (NABISCO BRANDS INC [US]) [X] 1,16 * page 5, line 27 - page 8; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4989720 (PRICE FLOYD W [US], et al) [A] 1-3,12,13,16-18,25,26* abstract *; | [DA]US5042638 (PRICE FLOYD W [US]) [DA] 11-13,25,26,28 * abstract * |