EP0788324 - VACUUM/HEAT FORMED CUSHION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROWN THERAPEUTICS, INC. 100 Florida Avenue Belleville, IL 62221 / US | [1997/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAEBE, Robert, H. 7 Persimmon Ridge Drive Belleville, IL 62221 / US | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | Gemmell, Peter Alan Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | Gemmell, Peter Alan, Dr. Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 7SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95938850.5 | 24.10.1995 | [1997/33] | WO1995US13648 | Priority number, date | US19940328724 | 25.10.1994 Original published format: US 328724 | [1997/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612426 | Date: | 02.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0788324 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/02, A47C27/10, A61G7/057, A47C4/54 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
A61G7/05715 (EP,US);
A61G5/1043 (EP,US);
A61G5/1045 (EP,US);
A61G5/1091 (EP,US);
A61G7/05707 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/33] | A47C7/02, A47C27/10, A61G7/057 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/33] | Title | German: | VAKUUM ODER HITZGEFORMTES KISSEN | [1997/33] | English: | VACUUM/HEAT FORMED CUSHION | [1997/33] | French: | COUSSIN FORME SOUS VIDE OU THERMOFORME | [1997/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 23.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 31.08.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2575764 (MORNER HANS G) [A] 62 * column 3, line 40 - line 45 *; | [YA]US3468311 (GALLAGHER JOHN P) [Y] 38,67 * column 2, line 9 - line 21 *[A] 29; | [XY]US5052068 (GRAEBE ROBERT H [US]) [X] 42,51,58-61,63-66,68-71 * column 2, line 38 - line 68; figure 1 * [Y] 38,67 | International search | [Y]US611585 ; | [Y]US2434641 (BURNS HENRY L); | [Y]US2575764 (MORNER HANS G); | [A]US3468311 (GALLAGHER JOHN P); | [X]US4422194 (VIESTURS GUNDAR E [US], et al); | [A]US4698864 (GRAEBE ROBERT H [US]); | [Y]US4962553 (MARQUIS CHARLES E [US]); | [Y]US5052068 (GRAEBE ROBERT H [US]); | [Y]WO9316622 (GRAEBE ROBERT H [US]); | [AP]US5444881 (LANDI CURTIS L [US], et al) |