EP0737212 - COLORED METALLIC PIGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILBERLINE MANUFACTURING CO. INC. Lincoln Drive P.O.Box B Tamaqua, PA 18252-0420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states SILBERLINE MANUFACTURING CO. INC. Lincoln Drive P.O.Box B Tamaqua, PA 18252-0420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEEMER, Craig, B. 412 South Tulpehochen Road Reading, PA 19601 / US | 02 /
HALBACH, Walter, S. 109 Woodland Road Wyomissing, PA 19610 / US | 03 /
JENKINS, William, G. 7 Sondra Drive Larksville, PA 18704 / US | 04 /
FERGUSON, Russell, L. 109 Cherrywood Lane Lehighton, PA 18235 / US | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95938882.8 | 20.10.1995 | [1996/42] | WO1995US13745 | Priority number, date | US19940332600 | 31.10.1994 Original published format: US 332600 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9613528 | Date: | 09.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737212 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737212 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/44, C08F292/00, C09C1/62, C09C1/64 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
C09B63/00 (EP,US);
C09C1/62 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/44 (EP,US);
C08F292/00 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (EP,US);
C09C1/644 (EP,US);
C01P2004/32 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | GEFÄRBTE METALLPIGMENTE | [1996/42] | English: | COLORED METALLIC PIGMENTS | [1996/42] | French: | PIGMENTS METALLIQUES COLORES | [1996/42] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 19.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.06.1998 | BE | 03.06.1998 | ES | 03.06.1998 | [2002/26] |
Former [1999/27] | AT | 03.06.1998 | |
BE | 03.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 03.06.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS61103906 ; | [A]JPS58141248 ; | [A]JPH0241370 ; | [A]BE891269 (TOYO ALUMINIUM KK); | [DA]US5037475 (CHIDA KYOICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,5 * claims 1,19 *; | [A]EP0477433 (ECKART STANDARD BRONZEPULVER [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * column W *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 27, Database accession no. 86-172214, & JPS61103906 A 19860522 (SUI KAGAKU KOGYO) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 39, Database accession no. 83-774209, & JPS58141248 A 19830822 (TOYO ALUMINIUM) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910211), vol. 114, no. 6, Database accession no. 44955s, page 101 [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [ ] - TAKIZAWA, MASAMI, TOSO TO TORYO, vol. 466, pages 50 - 5, XP000121896 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 12, Database accession no. 90-087772, & JPH0241370 A 19900209 (SHIKOKU KAKEN KOGYO) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * | Examination | - DATABASE WPI Week 8339 Derwent Publications Ltd., LondonGB; AN 83-774209 & | - JP,A,58 141 248 (TOYO ALUMINIUM) 22 August 1983 |