EP0789950 - APPARATUS FOR PROGRAMMABLE CIRCUIT AND SIGNAL SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I-Cube, Inc. 2605 Winchester Boulevard Campbell California 95008-5320 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states I-Cube, Inc. 2605 Winchester Boulevard Campbell, California 95008-5320 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSIEH, Wen-Jai 2633 Waverley Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
HORNG, Chi-Song 779 Talisman Court Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 03 /
WONG, Chun, Chiu, Daniel 4260 Newberry Court Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Skinner, Michael Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Skinner, Michael Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [1997/34] | Skinner, Michael Paul, et al c/o Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 95939027.9 | 31.10.1995 | [1997/34] | WO1995US14202 | Priority number, date | US19940333524 | 02.11.1994 Original published format: US 333524 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614688 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789950 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789950 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/0175, H03K19/173 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
H03K19/1736 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/34] | H03K19/0175 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR PROGRAMMIERBARE SCHALTUNG UND SIGNALVERARBEITUNG | [1997/34] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROGRAMMABLE CIRCUIT AND SIGNAL SWITCHING | [1997/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A UN CIRCUIT PROGRAMMABLE ET A LA COMMUTATION DE SIGNAUX | [1997/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 16.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.01.2002 | DE | 17.04.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/30] | DE | 17.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5282271 (HSIEH WEN-JAI [US], et al) [DA] 1,13,17,23 * column W * | International search | [A]US4670749 (FREEMAN ROSS H [US]); | [A]US4973956 (LIN WEN-TAI [US], et al) |