EP0792524 - POLYCRYSTALLINE FERROELECTRIC CAPACITOR HETEROSTRUCTURE EMPLOYING HYBRID ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telcordia Technologies, Inc. 445 South Street Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [1999/51] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states BELL COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH, INC. 445 South Street Morristown, New Jersey 07960-6438 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMESH, Ramamoorthy 13512 Green Castle Ridge Terrace Burtonsville, MD 20866 / US | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/19] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/36] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95939139.2 | 03.11.1995 | [1997/36] | WO1995US14740 | Priority number, date | US19940341728 | 18.11.1994 Original published format: US 341728 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616447 | Date: | 30.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0792524 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0792524 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/3205 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
H01L28/75 (EP,US);
H01L29/76 (KR);
H01L28/55 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | H01L29/76, H01L31/062 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/36] | Title | German: | POLYKRISTALLINE FERROELEKTRISCHE KONDENSATORHETEROSTRUKTUR MIT HYBRIDELEKTRODEN | [1997/36] | English: | POLYCRYSTALLINE FERROELECTRIC CAPACITOR HETEROSTRUCTURE EMPLOYING HYBRID ELECTRODES | [1997/36] | French: | HETEROSTRUCTURE DE CONDENSATEUR FERROELECTRIQUE POLYCRISTALLIN UTILISANT DES ELECTRODES HYBRIDES | [1997/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 29.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.07.2002 | IT | 31.07.2002 | SE | 31.10.2002 | GB | 03.11.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/51] | FR | 31.07.2002 | |
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
GB | 03.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/22] | SE | 31.10.2002 | |
GB | 03.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 31.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0448151 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [Y]EP0535736 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [YD]US5248564 (RAMESH RAMAMOORTHY [US]) | International search | [A]US5155658 (INAM ARUN [US], et al); | [A]US5248564 (RAMESH RAMAMOORTHY [US]); | [A]US5270298 (RAMESH RAMAMOORTHY [US]); | [AP]US5387459 (HUNG LIANG-SUN [US]) |