EP0797436 - NOVEL ADENOVIRAL VECTORS, PACKAGING CELL LINES, RECOMBINANT ADENOVIRUSES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELL GENESYS, INC. 322 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [1997/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Qing 3001 Ross Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
FINER, Mitchell, H. 54 Madera San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 03 /
JIA, Xiao-Chi 64 Burbank Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 95939149.1 | 03.11.1995 | [1997/40] | WO1995US14793 | Priority number, date | US19940333680 | 03.11.1994 Original published format: US 333680 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614061 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797436 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797436 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10322 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10343 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10352 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10362 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/40] | A61K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ADENOVIRALE VEKTOREN, VERPACKUNGSSZELLINIEN, REKOMBINANTE ADENOVIREN UND VERFAHREN | [1997/40] | English: | NOVEL ADENOVIRAL VECTORS, PACKAGING CELL LINES, RECOMBINANT ADENOVIRUSES AND METHODS | [1997/40] | French: | NOUVEAUX VECTEURS ADENOVIRAUX, LIGNEES CELLULAIRES D'ENCAPSIDATION, ADENOVIRUS RECOMBINES ET PROCEDES | [1997/40] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 21.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 04.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2006 | BE | 15.03.2006 | IT | 15.03.2006 | NL | 15.03.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | SE | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | ES | 26.06.2006 | PT | 16.08.2006 | [2008/21] |
Former [2008/06] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9412649 (GENZYME CORP [US]); | [XP]WO9527071 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) | International search | [Y]US5173414 (LEBKOWSKI JANE S [US], et al); | [Y]US5252479 (SRIVASTAVA ARUN [US]); | [Y]US5354678 (LEBKOWSKI JANE S [US], et al); | [YP]WO9428152 (TRANSGENE SA [FR], et al) |