EP0789893 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR RAPIDLY RENDERING PHOTO-REALISTIC SURFACES ON 3-DIMENSIONAL WIRE FRAMES AUTOMATICALLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTHONICS INCORPORATED Suite 201, 2801 Townesgate Road Westlake Village, CA 91361 / US | [1997/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BINNS, Bruce, W. 5165 W. Highway A1A Melbourne Beach, FL 32951-3210 / US | 02 /
PALM, Charles, S. 3819 Mainsail Circle Westlake Village, CA 91361 / US | 03 /
WEAVER, Suzanne, E. 5165 S. Highway A1A Melbourne Beach, FL 32951-3210 / US | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95939575.7 | 17.10.1995 | [1997/34] | WO1995US13689 | Priority number, date | US19940327471 | 21.10.1994 Original published format: US 327471 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9613018 | Date: | 02.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789893 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
G06T15/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND APPARAT ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN UND SCHNELLEN SICHTBARMACHEN VON PHOTOREALISTISCHEN OBERFLÄCHEN AUF DREIDIMENSIONALEN DRAHTRAHMEN | [1997/34] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR RAPIDLY RENDERING PHOTO-REALISTIC SURFACES ON 3-DIMENSIONAL WIRE FRAMES AUTOMATICALLY | [1997/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE RENDU PHOTOGRAPHIQUE AUTOMATIQUE RAPIDE DE SURFACES DE STRUCTURES FILAIRES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES | [1997/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 29.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 28.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/01] | 10.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0620409 (HUGHES MISSILE SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,10,11 * page 2, line 46 - line 52 * * page 3, line 12 - line 22; claim 1 *; | [E]EP0689167 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 3 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 41 *; | [A]EP0454129 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 3 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 20 * | International search | [AP]US5369736 (KATO MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [A]US5255352 (FALK EDWARD K [US]) | [Y] - ROBOT AND HUMAN COMMUNICATIONS, 1993 INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, SAKAGUCHI TATSUMI, "Analysis and Synthesis of Facial Expression Using High-Definition Wire Frame Model", pp. 194-199. | [Y] - VIRTUAL REALITY, 1993 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, OHYA JUN et al., "Real-time Reproduction of 3D Human Images in Virtual Space Teleconferencing", pp. 408-414. | [Y] - FOLEY JAMES D. et al., "Computer Graphics: Principles and Practices", ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING CO., INC., 1990, pages 473-477. |