EP0783309 - USE OF A CORTICOSTEROID TO REDUCE THE ADVERSE EFFECTS OF A PERFLUOROCHEMICAL EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEMAGEN/PFC 11810 Borman Drive St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | [1997/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODIN, Thomas, H. 311 Stephanie Lane Manchester, MO 63011 / US | 02 /
KAUFMAN, Robert, J. 8129 Stanford Avenue University City, MO 63130 / US | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95939580.7 | 24.10.1995 | [1997/29] | WO1995US13714 | Priority number, date | US19940331326 | 28.10.1994 Original published format: US 331326 | [1997/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9613268 | Date: | 09.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0783309 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/57 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/57, A61K31/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/29] | Title | German: | WERWENDUNG EINES KORTIKOSTERDES ZUR VERMEIDUNG DER NACHTEILIGEN WIRKUNG EINER PERFLUORCHEMISCHEN EMULSION | [1997/29] | English: | USE OF A CORTICOSTEROID TO REDUCE THE ADVERSE EFFECTS OF A PERFLUOROCHEMICAL EMULSION | [1997/29] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN CORTICOSTEROIDE POUR REDUIRE LES EFFETS SECONDAIRES D'UNE EMULSION PERFLUOROCHIMIQUE | [1997/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/29] | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - "Perfluorocarbons as blood substitutes: the early years. Experience with Fluosol DA-20% in the 1980s", ARTIF.CELLS BLOOD SUBSTITUTES IMMOBILIZATION BIOTECHNOL., (19940908), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 955 - 963, XP000563696 [X] 1-13 * page 958, paragraph 1 * * page 960, line 6 - line 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10731199409138794 | [X] - "Les emulsions de fluorocarbures comme transporteurs d'oxyène injectables.Progrès récents et perspectives", REV.FR.TRANSFUS.HEMOBIOL., vol. 35, no. 6, pages 391 - 406, XP000563697 [X] 1-13 * page 400, line 37 - page 401, line 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1140-4639(05)80146-7 | [X] - "Activation of Plasma complement by perfluorocarbon artificial blood: probable mechanism of adverse pulmonary reactions in treated patients and rationale for corticosteroid prophylaxis", BLOOD, vol. 59, no. 6, pages 1299 - 1304, XP000563939 [X] 1-13 * page 1301, column R, line 3 - line 7 * * page 1303, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1299 * | [A] - "Prophylaxis with corticosteroids and cyclooxygenase inhibitors: effect on the delayed febrile response after intravenous infusion of perfluorochemical emulsions in conscious swine", FASEB J., vol. 6, no. 4, page A1055 [A] 1-13 * abstract no. 689 * | [A] - "Endothelial response to perfluorochemical perfusion", SCANNING ELECTRON.MICROSCOP., vol. 1984/1, pages 311 - 319 [A] 1-13 * page 315 - page 316 * |