EP0809780 - COMPACT KEPLERIAN TELESCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netzer, Yishay 112 Yuvalim 20142 Doar Na Misgav / IL | [1997/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95939634.2 | 26.10.1995 | [1997/49] | WO1995US13970 | Priority number, date | IL19940111427 | 27.10.1994 Original published format: IL 11142794 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9613695 | Date: | 09.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809780 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0809780 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F41G1/40, F41G3/22, G02B5/04, G02B23/04, G02B23/08, G03B13/08, G11B7/00, G01D5/30, G02B27/64, G02B17/02 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
G02B23/02 (EP);
G02B17/02 (EP);
G02B23/00 (EP);
G02B27/644 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/49] | F41G1/40, F41G3/22, G02B5/04, G02B23/04, G02B23/08, G03B13/08, G11B7/00, G01D5/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/49] | Title | German: | Kompaktes Keplersches Teleskop | [1997/49] | English: | COMPACT KEPLERIAN TELESCOPE | [1997/49] | French: | TELESCOPE KEPLERIEN COMPACT | [1997/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 23.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02284113 ; | [X]JPH03287109 ; | [X]JPH03287108 ; | [X]JPH0458216 ; | [A]US3051046 (THOMPSON KENNETH B) [A] 1,4,13 * figures 8,14 *; | [X]US3409343 (WALTER ZAPP) [X] 1,2,7,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3947095 (MOULTRIE CHARLES W) [A] 1,3,5 * column 4, line 12 - line 20; figure 5 *; | [X]US4013340 (MUKAI TETSURO, et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,13 * column 1, line 16 - line 38 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 2; figure 10 *; | [X]GB1516799 (ESSILOR INT) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * page 2, line 109 - line 115 * * page 3, line 94 - page 4, line 53; figures 1,5 *; | [X]US4131333 (HUMPHREY WILLIAM E) [X] 1,2,10,11 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4563061 (ELLIS STAFFORD M [GB]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 21 - line 29; figure 1 *; | [A]US4576449 (RUEGER RODERICH [DE]) [A] 10,11 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4673262 (TSUJI SADAHIKO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figure 5 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910208), vol. 015, no. 055, Database accession no. (P - 1164), & JP02284113 A 19901121 (CANON INC) [X] 1,2,4,10,11,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920324), vol. 016, no. 117, Database accession no. (P - 1328), & JP03287109 A 19911217 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [X] 1,2,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920324), vol. 016, no. 117, Database accession no. (P - 1328), & JP03287108 A 19911217 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7-9,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920609), vol. 016, no. 252, Database accession no. (P - 1367), & JP04058216 A 19920225 (SANPEI GOTO) [X] 1-3,13 * abstract * | [DA] - THOMAS W STONE, "Hybrid Diffractive-Refractive telescope", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (1990), vol. 1212, pages 257 - 266, XP002072444 [DA] 5 * page 257 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.17987 | International search | [X]US5130855 (MUKAI HIROMU [JP], et al) |