EP0753114 - CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE HYDROSTATIC TRANSMISSION INCLUDING A PULSE WIDTH MODULATION RATIO CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [1999/37] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesta, MD 20817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARKIN, Robert, Francis 51 Broad Street Pittsfield, MA 01201 / US | 02 /
KERR, William, R. 34 East Windsor Road Peru, MA 01235 / US | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1997/18] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1997/03] | Goode, Ian Roy GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95939649.0 | 31.10.1995 | [1997/03] | WO1995US14034 | Priority number, date | US19950380269 | 30.01.1995 Original published format: US 380269 | [1997/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623997 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0753114 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0753114 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/42 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
F16H61/431 (EP,US);
F16H61/423 (KR);
F16H61/433 (KR);
F16H2039/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, SE [1997/03] | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES HYDROSTATISCHES GETRIEBE MIT PULSBREITENMODULIERTER ÜBERSETZUNGSVERHÄLTNISSTEUERUNG | [1997/03] | English: | CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE HYDROSTATIC TRANSMISSION INCLUDING A PULSE WIDTH MODULATION RATIO CONTROLLER | [1997/03] | French: | TRANSMISSION HYDROSTATIQUE VARIABLE DE FA ON CONTINUE COMPRENANT UNE COMMANDE DU RAPPORT DE TRANSMISSION PAR MODULATION DES IMPULSIONS EN LARGEUR | [1997/03] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 08.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.02.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   06.03.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.1999 | ES | 15.09.1999 | IT | 15.09.1999 | SE | 15.09.1999 | IE | 15.11.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
ES | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
IE | 15.11.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
IE | 15.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
IE | 15.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 15.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3204411 (STOCKTON THOMAS R) [A] 1,7,11 * column W *; | [YA]GB2055455 (DEERE & CO) [Y] 1,7,11 * abstract * [A] 6,16; | [A]US4493189 (SLATER HARRY F [US])[A] 1,7,11; | [Y]WO9212357 (ADVANCED POWER TECHNOLOGY [US]) [Y] 1,7,11 * column W *; | [A]US5355772 (SHIMADA TAKAMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,7-9,11,13-15 * column W * |