EP0792327 - CLEANING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAY CHEMICAL COMPANY P.O. Box 18407 Greensboro, NC 27419 / US | [1997/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PURCELL, Karen 5143 Autumncrest Drive Greensboro, NC 27407 / US | 02 /
HAWES, Charles, L. 1004 Bryce Court Summerville, SC 29483 / US | 03 /
HARRY, David, R., Jr. 8201 Kelly Ford Road Oak Ridge, NC 27310 / US | 04 /
LA COSSE, Gerald, E. 320 E. Highway 62 Greensboro, NC 27406 / US | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95940062.3 | 17.11.1995 | [1997/36] | WO1995US15114 | Priority number, date | US19940342037 | 17.11.1994 Original published format: US 342037 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616132 | Date: | 30.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0792327 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0792327 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C09D9/04 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
C11D3/2044 (EP,US);
C09D9/04 (EP,US);
C11D17/0021 (EP,US);
C11D3/18 (EP,US);
C11D3/2037 (EP,US);
C11D3/2062 (EP,US);
C11D3/2068 (EP,US);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C11D3/28 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/36] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [1997/36] | English: | CLEANING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [1997/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS NETTOYANTES ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [1997/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Request for further processing for: | 29.09.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9100893 (STEVENS SCIENCES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10,15-20 * claims 1,3,12,13 *; | [X]EP0604372 (ACKLIN HANSPETER [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10,15-20 * claim 1 * |