EP0794938 - NOVEL SUBSTITUTED DTPA DERIVATIVES, THEIR METAL COMPLEXES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THESE COMPLEXES AND THEIR USE IN DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Franz-Karl Elsenbruchstrasse 15a D-13467 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Michael Kiefheider Weg 10 D-13505 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KRAUSE, Werner Turmfalkenstrasse 39a D-13505 Berlin / DE | 04 /
SPECK, Ulrich Fürstendamm 20 D-13465 Berlin / DE | 05 /
SCHUHMANN-GIAMPIERI, Gabriele Marschnerstrasse 34 D-12203 Berlin / DE | 06 /
MÜHLER, Andreas 24 Nimitz Road Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | 07 /
BALZER, Thomas Schwatlowstrasse 12 D-12207 Berlin / DE | 08 /
PRESS, Wolf-Rüdiger Manteuffelstrasse 23 D-12103 Berlin / DE | [1997/38] | Application number, filing date | 95940988.9 | 20.11.1995 | [1997/38] | WO1995EP04548 | Priority number, date | US19940351086 | 30.11.1994 Original published format: US 351086 | US19950387408 | 13.02.1995 Original published format: US 387408 | [1997/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616928 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0794938 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/76, A61K49/00, A61K31/195, C07C229/16, C07C229/22 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
A61K49/0002 (EP,US);
A61K49/06 (US);
A61K49/0004 (EP,US);
A61K49/04 (EP,US);
A61K49/103 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/38] | Title | German: | NEUARTIG SUBSTITUIERTE DTPA-DERIVATE, DEREN METALLKOMPLEXE, DIESE KOMPLEXE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE MITTEL UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER DIAGNOSTIK UND THERAPIE | [1997/38] | English: | NOVEL SUBSTITUTED DTPA DERIVATIVES, THEIR METAL COMPLEXES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THESE COMPLEXES AND THEIR USE IN DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY | [1997/38] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES D'ACIDE PENTACETIQUE DE DIETHYLENE TRIAMINE (DTPA), LEURS COMPLEXES METALLIFERES, FORMULATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT LESDITS COMPLEXES ET LEUR UTILISATION A DES FINS DIAGNOSTIQUES ET THERAPEUTIQUES | [1997/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/49] | 13.07.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0071564 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [AD] 1-25 * claim - *; | [A]EP0230893 (BRACCO IND CHIMICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-25 * page 26 - page 27; claim - *; | [A]DE3710730 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1-25 * claim - *; | [A]EP0367223 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 26 - page 31; claim - *; | [A]EP0405704 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1-25 * claim - *; | [A]EP0450742 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1-25* claim - * |