EP0795217 - MULTIPLE PATH RESONATOR WITH LONGITUDINAL PUMP ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Ozygus, Bernd Prinzregentenstrasse 18 10717 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Erhard, Jürgen Fehrbelliner Strasse 36 10119 Berlin / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Ozygus, Bernd Prinzregentenstrasse 18 10717 Berlin / DE | |||
For all designated states Erhard, Jürgen Fehrbelliner Strasse 36 10119 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZYGUS, Bernd Prinzregentenstrasse 18 D-10717 Berlin / DE | 02 /
ERHARD, Jürgen Fehrbelliner Strasse 36 D-10119 Berlin / DE | [1997/38] | Application number, filing date | 95941033.3 | 28.11.1995 | [1997/38] | WO1995EP04677 | Priority number, date | DE19944444511 | 30.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4444511 | [1997/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9617418 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0795217 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0795217 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/0941, H01S3/06, H01S3/081, H01S3/109 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
H01S3/0602 (EP,US);
H01S3/081 (EP,US);
H01S3/0941 (EP,US);
H01S3/109 (EP,US);
H01S3/0621 (EP,US);
H01S3/08095 (EP,US);
H01S3/0813 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/38] | Title | German: | MULTIPATH-RESONATOR MIT LONGITUDINALER PUMPANORDNUNG | [1997/38] | English: | MULTIPLE PATH RESONATOR WITH LONGITUDINAL PUMP ARRANGEMENT | [1997/38] | French: | RESONATEUR A TRAJETS MULTIPLES AVEC ENSEMBLE DE POMPAGE LONGITUDINAL | [1997/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 26.06.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3365671 (KOGELNIK HERWIG W) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5237584 (SHANNON DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7-10 * column 3 - column 4; figures 1A,1B,13 *; | [A]EP0455383 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [A] 4,5 * column 6; figure 1 *; | [A] - I.A.RAMSAY ET AL., "A RAY ANALYSIS OF OPTICAL RESONATORS FORMED BY TWO SPHERICAL MIRRORS", APPLIED OPTICS, NEW YORK US, vol. 9, no. 2, pages 385 - 398 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - A.L.PARDUE,JR.ET AL., "REACTIVE Q SWITCHING IN A CO2 MULTIMODE-MULTIPASS LASER OSCILLATOR", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS., NEW YORK US, no. 11, pages 753 - 754 | [PA] - P.V.KOROLENKO ET AL., "MAIN PROPERTIES AND POTENTIAL PRACTICAL APPLICATIONS OF M-MODE LASERS", QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK US, vol. 25, no. 6, pages 536 - 539, XP000512173 [PA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/QE1995v025n06ABEH000407 |