EP0794936 - METHOD FOR PREPARING FLUOROANILINES FROM NITROFLUOROBENZENE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1998/16] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORDIER, Georges 2, impasse des Glycines F-69340 Francheville / FR | 02 /
GUIDOT, Gilbert 131, rue Coste F-69300 Caluire-et-Cuire / FR | 03 /
MARION, Philippe 10, rue Chambfort F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 04 /
MERCIER, Claude 85, avenue du Point du Jour F-69005 Lyon / FR | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [1997/38] | Application number, filing date | 95941159.6 | 29.11.1995 | [1997/38] | WO1995FR01575 | Priority number, date | FR19940014395 | 30.11.1994 Original published format: FR 9414395 | FR19940015956 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415956 | [1997/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616926 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0794936 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794936 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/36, C07C211/52 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
C07C209/36 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/36, C07C211/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLUOROANILINEN AUS FLUORONITROBENZOLEN | [1997/38] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING FLUOROANILINES FROM NITROFLUOROBENZENE COMPOUNDS | [1997/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE FLUOROANILINES A PARTIR DE COMPOSES BENZENIQUES FLUORES NITRES | [1997/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98113371.3 / EP0875497 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.1999 | ES | 17.03.1999 | GR | 17.03.1999 | SE | 17.03.1999 | DK | 17.06.1999 | PT | 17.06.1999 | IE | 19.10.1999 | LU | 29.11.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
ES | 17.03.1999 | ||
GR | 17.03.1999 | ||
SE | 17.03.1999 | ||
DK | 17.06.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
ES | 17.03.1999 | ||
GR | 17.03.1999 | ||
SE | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
MC | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
ES | 17.03.1999 | ||
GR | 17.03.1999 | ||
SE | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
GR | 17.03.1999 | ||
SE | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
GR | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
GR | 17.03.1999 | ||
IE | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
IE | 17.03.1999 | ||
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 17.03.1999 | |
PT | 17.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 17.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]DD154214 ; | [A]US2619503 (GEORGE BENNER ROLAND, et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 4 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 2 *; | [A]US3361819 (RICHARD KOSAK JOHN, et al) [A] 1,2,6-8 * column 2, line 28 - line 69; example 1 *; | [D]US4140719 (TULL ROGER J, et al); | [A]EP0001825 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 9, line 18 - page 11, line 10; examples 1,2 *; | [A]EP0458006 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1,2,6-8 * page 4, line 38 - page 5, line 4 *; | [A]FR2664590 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * example 10 *; | [A]EP0562435 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 19; examples 1,3-5 *; | [D]US5294742 (SCHACH THOMAS [DE], et al) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 31, Database accession no. 82-63760E, & DD154214 A 19820303 (VEB LEUNA-WERK W ULBRICH) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - J. MASON ET AL., "Synthesis of 2,4-difluoroaniline and 1,3-difluorobenzene from 1,2,4-trichlorobenzene", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940509), vol. 120, no. 19, Database accession no. 244212, page 956 [A] 1,14-16 * abstract * | [ ] - SYNTH. COMMUN., vol. 24, no. 4, pages 529 - 532 |