EP0798994 - URINARY INCONTINENCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Connolly, John, G. 76 Grenville Street Toronto, Ontario M5S 1B2 / CA | [1997/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, Dr., et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [1997/41] | Moore, John Hamilton, et al J. H. Moore & Co., 8 Gaiafields Road Lichfield, Staffs. WS13 7LT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95941554.8 | 19.12.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995CA00717 | Priority number, date | GB19940025578 | 19.12.1994 Original published format: GB 9425578 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619158 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0798994 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0798994 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
A61F2/005 (EP,US);
Y10S128/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | HARNINKONTINENZVORRICHTUNG | [1997/41] | English: | URINARY INCONTINENCE DEVICE | [1997/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 05.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US3939821 (ROTH RUSSELL B) [XD] 1-3,5 * figures 1-4; examples 1,2 *; | [XD]US3952726 (HENNIG GERHARD R, et al) [XD] 1,2 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 27; figure - *; | [A]DE2624418 (HENNIG GERHARD) [A] 4 * page 4, paragraph 2; figure . *; | [XDY]US4154226 (HENNIG GERHARD [DE], et al) [XD] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 8; | [XD]DE3139811 (HENNIG GERHARD PROF DR ING, et al) [XD] 1-3,5 * page 6, line 29 - page 8, line 6; figure - *; | [X]FR2530947 (NEOSYSTEMES [FR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0182409 (APPLIED MED TECH BV [NL]) [Y] 8 * abstract *; | [A]US4726378 (KAPLAN MORTON R [US]) [A] 5* abstract * |