EP0742932 - THEFT PROTECTION FOR COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/47] | THEFT PROTECTION FOR ELECTRICALLY-POWERED ARTICLES | ||
[1999/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICL Systems Aktiebolag Box 40 S-164 93 Kista / SE | [1996/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SJOOQUIST, Peter, Bertil, Tom Sandbacksgatan 15B S-582 25 Linkoping / SE | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Dupuy, Susan Mary International Computers Limited Intellectual Property Department Cavendish Road Stevenage, Herts. SG1 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Dupuy, Susan Mary International Computers Limited Intellectual Property Department Cavendish Road Stevenage, Herts. SG1 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 95941685.0 | 01.12.1995 | [1996/47] | WO1995EP04806 | Priority number, date | GB19940024474 | 03.12.1994 Original published format: GB 9424474 | [1996/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618175 | Date: | 13.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742932 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742932 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14, G06F1/30, G06F1/00 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
G08B13/1409 (EP,US);
G06F1/14 (EP,US);
G06F1/30 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
G06F21/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | DIEBSTAHLSCHUTZ FÜR COMPUTERSYSTEME | [1999/13] | English: | THEFT PROTECTION FOR COMPUTER SYSTEM | [1999/13] | French: | PROTECTION CONTRE LE VOL DESTINEE A DES SYSTEMES D'ORDINATEUR | [1999/13] |
Former [1996/47] | DIEBSTAHLSCHUTZ FÜR ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENE GERÄTE | ||
Former [1996/47] | THEFT PROTECTION FOR ELECTRICALLY-POWERED ARTICLES | ||
Former [1996/47] | PROTECTION CONTRE LE VOL DESTINEE A DES ARTICLES ALIMENTES PAR L'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 10.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0145405 (INT ELECTRONIC TECH [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5,6,8-12; | [Y]US4584651 (CAREY JR JOHN L [US], et al) [Y] 3,6,8-10,12 * column W *; | [Y]EP0458510 (MARTIN RICHARD A [US]) [Y] 5,6,11,12 * abstract * | Examination | US5021916 | EP0636516 |