EP0799160 - PROCESS FOR THE CONTINUOUS TREATMENT OF WASTE WATER CONTAINING DISSOLVED METALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.I.M. Hüttenwerke Duisburg Gesellschaft mit Beschränkter Haftung Richard-Seiffert-Strasse 20 47249 Duisburg / DE | [1997/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBISCH, Joachim Wilhelm-Grobben-Strasse 19 D-47906 Kempen / DE | 02 /
STEIL, Hans-Ulrich Heltorfer Mark 137 D-40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
BEISHEIM, Birgit Sanddornstrasse 22 D-47269 Duisburg / DE | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr, Weidener Schüll, Häckel Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95941726.2 | 19.12.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995EP05034 | Priority number, date | DE19944445480 | 20.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4445480 | [1997/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619414 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799160 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799160 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C02F9/00, C02F1/62, C02F1/66 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
C02F1/70 (EP);
C02F1/62 (EP);
C02F1/66 (EP);
C02F2101/103 (EP);
C02F2101/20 (EP);
C02F2101/203 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN BEHANDLUNG VON GELÖSTE METALLE ENTHALTENDEM ABWASSER | [1997/41] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE CONTINUOUS TREATMENT OF WASTE WATER CONTAINING DISSOLVED METALS | [1997/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT EN CONTINU D'EAUX USEES CONTENANT DES METAUX DISSOUS | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 23.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS63294986 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890327), vol. 13, no. 124, Database accession no. (C - 580), & JP63294986 A 19881201 (MIYOSHI OIL &FATS) [X] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * |